This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2019 at 07:08:57 (UTC).

American Lamprecht Transport, Inc. v. Dill et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 American Lamprecht Transport, Inc filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03839

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Lamprecht Transport, Inc.

Defendants

Kevin Dill

Joseph Dill

Jean G. Dill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Patrick Connelly

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

321 N. Clark, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60654

Michael Charles Stephenson

Attorney at Rock Fusco & Connelly, LLC

321 N. Clark St., Ste. 2200

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant Attorneys

Sean Brendan Crotty

Attorney at Crotty & Schiltz, LLC

120 N. Lasalle Street, 20Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Francis Charles Wilkie

Attorney at Crotty & Schiltz, LLC

120 N. Lasalle Street, 20Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

Eugene J. Schiltz

Attorney at Crotty & Schiltz, LLC

120 N. Lasalle Street, 20Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Lamprecht Transport, Inc. without Prejudice Under Fed.R.Civ.P 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#21

(#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint #18 is granted. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint (consistent with the parameters proposed in Plaintiff's motion) by 8/5/19. Defendants shall file any responsive pleading by 8/28/19. The 7/25/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The initial appearance previously set for 7/25/19 is stricken and reset for 9/17/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#20

(#20) Defendants Statement Regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint STATEMENT by Jean G. Dill, Joseph Dill, Kevin Dill (Schiltz, Eugene) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#19

(#19) Plaintiff American Lamprecht Transport, Inc's NOTICE of Motion by Michael Charles Stephenson for presentment of motion for leave to file #18 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/25/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

18 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#18

(#18) MOTION by Plaintiff American Lamprecht Transport, Inc. for leave to file an Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#17

(#17) AMENDED Initial Status Report (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#16

(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The parties' joint motion for leave to file amended initial status report instanter #14 is granted, and the parties shall file the status report as a separate docket entry. The 7/23/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Additionally, the initial status conference previously set for 7/18/19 is stricken and reset for 7/25/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. If, as indicated, Defendants file a motion to dismiss in lieu of an answer, they should notice it for presentment on 7/25/19, and Plaintiff should be prepared on 7/25/19 to make an election as per the Court's standing order on motions to dismiss. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Motion by Michael Charles Stephenson for presentment of motion for leave to file #14 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/23/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

14 #1

Exhibit 1

#14

(#14) MOTION by Plaintiff American Lamprecht Transport, Inc. for leave to file their Amended Initial Status Report, Instanter, Joint Motion by the Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Lamprecht Transport, Inc. as to Jean G. Dill on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 7/18/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 7/8/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff American Lamprecht Transport, Inc. by Matthew Patrick Connelly (Connelly, Matthew) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff American Lamprecht Transport, Inc. by Michael Charles Stephenson (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by American Lamprecht Transport, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15908784.(Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Lamprecht Transport, Inc. without Prejudice Under Fed.R.Civ.P 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint #18 is granted. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint (consistent with the parameters proposed in Plaintiff's motion) by 8/5/19. Defendants shall file any responsive pleading by 8/28/19. The 7/25/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The initial appearance previously set for 7/25/19 is stricken and reset for 9/17/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Defendants Statement Regarding Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint STATEMENT by Jean G. Dill, Joseph Dill, Kevin Dill (Schiltz, Eugene) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Plaintiff American Lamprecht Transport, Inc's NOTICE of Motion by Michael Charles Stephenson for presentment of motion for leave to file #18 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/25/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION by Plaintiff American Lamprecht Transport, Inc. for leave to file an Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) AMENDED Initial Status Report (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The parties' joint motion for leave to file amended initial status report instanter #14 is granted, and the parties shall file the status report as a separate docket entry. The 7/23/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Additionally, the initial status conference previously set for 7/18/19 is stricken and reset for 7/25/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. If, as indicated, Defendants file a motion to dismiss in lieu of an answer, they should notice it for presentment on 7/25/19, and Plaintiff should be prepared on 7/25/19 to make an election as per the Court's standing order on motions to dismiss. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Motion by Michael Charles Stephenson for presentment of motion for leave to file #14 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/23/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION by Plaintiff American Lamprecht Transport, Inc. for leave to file their Amended Initial Status Report, Instanter, Joint Motion by the Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STATUS Report , Initial by American Lamprecht Transport, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Lamprecht Transport, Inc. as to Jean G. Dill on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Jean G. Dill, and Joseph Dill. (acm) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Kevin Dill (yt) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 7/18/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 7/8/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff American Lamprecht Transport, Inc. by Matthew Patrick Connelly (Connelly, Matthew) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff American Lamprecht Transport, Inc. by Michael Charles Stephenson (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by American Lamprecht Transport, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15908784.(Stephenson, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Patrick Connelly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Charles Stephenson