This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/30/2022 at 13:31:16 (UTC).

AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Berman Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02250

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Berman Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL

Defendants

U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

245 Murray Ln. Sw, Mailstop 0485

Washington, DC 20528

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily Creighton

Attorney at AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL

1331 G Street, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20005

Raul A. Pinto

Attorney at AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL

1331 G Street, Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorney

Kenneth A. Adebonojo

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

6 #1

Exhibit A

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Raul A. Pinto on behalf of AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Pinto, Raul) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

4 #1

Notice and Consent

4 #4

Main Document

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Creighton, Emily) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/4/2022) (znmw). (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/4/2022) (znmw). (Entered: 08/01/2022)

1 #9

Summons Civil Clerk Summons

1 #8

Summons ICE Summons

1 #7

Summons DHS Summons

1 #6

Summons Atty Gen Summons

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/01/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/1/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/1/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 8/31/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Raul A. Pinto on behalf of AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Pinto, Raul) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave of Raul Pinto to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's organization, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Since the applicant is holding himself out to the public and to this Court as working from an address in Washington, DC, he is expected to submit an application for membership to the District of Columbia Bar within 30 days. SO ORDERED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/9/22. (DMK) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Raul Pinto, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9408092. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Creighton, Emily) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/4/2022) (znmw). (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/4/2022) (znmw). (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9407938) filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Atty Gen Summons, #7 Summons DHS Summons, #8 Summons ICE Summons, #9 Summons Civil Clerk Summons)(Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth A. Adebonojo