This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:39:00 (UTC).

American Home Shield Corporation v. Specter

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 American Home Shield Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Specter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane K. Vescovo and Mark S. Norris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02184

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

Presiding Judge

Mark S. Norris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Home Shield Corporation

Defendant

David Specter

Not Classified By Court

Donna L. Russell

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Louis P. Britt, III

Attorney at FORDHARRISON, LLP

1715 Aaron Brenner Drive, Suite 200

Memphis, TN 38120

Russell W. Jackson

Attorney at FORDHARRISON, LLP

1715 Aaron Brenner Drive, Suite 200

Memphis, TN 38120

Defendant Attorneys

Edward Howard Trent

Attorney at WIMBERLY LAWSON WRIGHT DAVES & JONES, PLLC

550 Main Avenue, Suite 900

Knoxville, TN 37901

Darren Oved

Attorney at OVED & OVED LLP

401 Greenwich Street

New York, NY 10013

Glen Lenihan

Attorney at OVED & OVED LLP

401 Greenwich Street

New York, NY 10013

Fredrick J. Bissinger

Attorney at WIMBERLY LAWSON WRIGHT DAVES & JONES, PLLC

214 2Nd Avenue North, Suite 3

Nashville, TN 37201

Andrew J. Urgenson

Attorney at OVED & OVED LLP

401 Greenwich Street

New York, NY 10013

 

Court Documents

#51

(#51) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. A copy of this Preliminary Injunction shall immediately be delivered to Defendant and to his current employer, Choice Home Warranty. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 4/26/19. (des) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#50

(#50) ORDER granting in part #36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 4/25/19. (des) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#48

RESTRICTED

#47

(#47) ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 4/18/19. (des) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

46 #2

Proposed Order

46 #1

Certificate of Consultation

#46

(#46) MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telphone for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by David Specter. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation, #2 Proposed Order)(Oved, Darren) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

36 #1

Memorandum

#36

(#44) ORDER granting #42 Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order. #36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for in-person hearing on Monday, April 22, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. before the Honorable Jon P. McCalla, by interchange. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 4/18/19. (des) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#6

(#10) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #6 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , Proposed Order Submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) filed by David Specter has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Pro Hac Filing Fee not paid. Use the event "Other Documents to pay the fee.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Judge Mark S. Norris and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #5

Exhibit 1 - Restraining Bond

1 #4

Exhibit 1 - State Fiat Order

1 #3

Exhibit 1 - Verified Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - State Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Specter from Chancery Court Thirteen Judicial District of Tennessee, Memphis, case number CH-19-0383-1 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3021098), filed by David Specter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Summons, #3 Exhibit 1 - Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit 1 - State Fiat Order, #5 Exhibit 1 - Restraining Bond, #6 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Trent, Edward) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) TRANSCRIPT RELEASE NOTICE: By Administrative Order 2008-35 the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee implemented a policy regarding remote access to electronic transcripts. Pursuant to that policy, as well as Civil Rule 5.2 and Criminal Rule 49.1, each party's attorney is required to review a transcript for information that should be redacted pursuant to the Judicial Conference's privacy policy which requires that Social Security numbers be redacted to show only the last four digits; birth dates should contain only the year of birth; individuals known to be minors should be referred to with initials; and financial account numbers should be redacted to the last four digits. Additionally, in criminal case files, home addresses should reveal only the city and state of residence.Our records indicate that the 90-day restriction on public access to an electronic transcript(s) in this matter will lapse within 10 days. If a redaction request is required but has not been filed, please do so immediately. Please feel free to contact our office for further guidance on this issue. (re: DE#48 ; release date 7/22/2019) (tlh) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. A copy of this Preliminary Injunction shall immediately be delivered to Defendant and to his current employer, Choice Home Warranty. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 4/26/19. (des) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) ORDER granting in part #36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 4/25/19. (des) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • (#49) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 4/22/2019. Louis P. Britt, III, and Russell W. Jackson appeared for the Plaintiff. Andrew J. Urgenson and Darren Oved appeared telephonically for the Defendant. Counsel arguments heard and matter taken under advisement. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey.) (jrs) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 3, 2019 before Judge Mark Norris. Court Reporter Lisa Mayo, Telephone number (901) 495-1537. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in this matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript, and twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Request for Redaction. Redaction is the responsibility of the attorneys and pro se litigants who attended the hearing to which the transcription applies. Each party is responsible for reviewing and requesting redaction of testimony of witnesses that were called for the party and for that party's own statements. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal.. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/29/2019. Redaction Request due 5/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2019. (Mayo, Lisa) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 4/18/19. (des) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telphone for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by David Specter. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation, #2 Proposed Order)(Oved, Darren) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) SETTING LETTER: A Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for Monday, 4/22/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. (jrs) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER granting #42 Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order. #36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for in-person hearing on Monday, April 22, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. before the Honorable Jon P. McCalla, by interchange. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 4/18/19. (des) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) RESPONSE to Motion re #42 MOTION to Extend Restraining Order filed by David Specter. (Oved, Darren) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #6 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , Proposed Order Submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) filed by David Specter has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Pro Hac Filing Fee not paid. Use the event "Other Documents to pay the fee.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3023773) by David Specter. (Urgenson, Andrew) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell W. Jackson on behalf of American Home Shield Corporation (Jackson, Russell) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3023750) by David Specter. (Lenihan, Glen) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , Proposed Order Submitted (Filing Fee $150 Rec # ATMWDC 3023703) by David Specter. (Oved, Darren) Modified on 3/26/2019 (jae). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Mark S. Norris and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Specter from Chancery Court Thirteen Judicial District of Tennessee, Memphis, case number CH-19-0383-1 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3021098), filed by David Specter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Summons, #3 Exhibit 1 - Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit 1 - State Fiat Order, #5 Exhibit 1 - Restraining Bond, #6 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Trent, Edward) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.