This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2021 at 13:30:40 (UTC).

American Home Assurance Company v. Makita Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 American Home Assurance Company filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Makita Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon E DeGuilio and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00252

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon E DeGuilio

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Home Assurance Company

Defendants

Makita Corporation of America

Makita U.S.A., Inc.

Sony Energy Devices Corporation

Sony Corporation

Makita Corporation

Sony Corporation of America

Murata Manufacturing Company, Ltd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan B McMaster PHV

Attorney at Denenberg Tuffley PLLC

28411 Northwestern Hwy Ste 600

Southfield, MI 48034

Ben C Lesnick PHV

Attorney at Denenberg Tuffley PLLC

28411 Northwestern Hwy Ste 600

Southfield, MI 48034

Geoffrey D Farnham

Attorney at Denenberg Tuffley PLLC

28411 Northwestern Hwy Ste 600

Southfield, MI 48034

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan T Barton

Attorney at Stanton Barton LLC

8000 Maryland Ave Ste 450

St Louis, MO 63105

Jessica Williams Schnelker

Attorney at Church Church Hittle & Antrim LLP - Nob/IN

2 N Ninth St

Noblesville, IN 46060

 

Court Documents

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

1 #4

Exhibit D - Letter to Makita - Sony Requesting Reimbursement

1 #3

Exhibit C - Mohammed Al Jakoush Affidavit

1 #2

Exhibit B - SCA Consent to Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Summons Issued as to Makita Corporation, Murata Manufacturing Company, Ltd, Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Energy Devices Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Proposed Summons filed by American Home Assurance Company. (Lesnick PHV, Ben) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Proposed Summons filed by American Home Assurance Company. (Lesnick PHV, Ben) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Proposed Summons filed by American Home Assurance Company. (Lesnick PHV, Ben) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Proposed Summons filed by American Home Assurance Company. (Lesnick PHV, Ben) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Proposed Summons filed by American Home Assurance Company. (Lesnick PHV, Ben) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ben C Lesnick PHV for American Home Assurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/30/2021. (ace) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Application for Attorney Ben C. Lesnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff American Home Assurance Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4558594(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alan B McMaster PHV for American Home Assurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/27/2021. (ace) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Application for Attorney Alan B. McMaster to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of American Home Assurance Company a/s/o Forest River, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4553723(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Makita U.S.A., Inc..(Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Makita Corporation of America.(Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Makita Corporation of America re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Consent to Removal of Newly Served Defendant (Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan T Barton on behalf of Makita Corporation of America, Makita U.S.A., Inc. (Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. **NEW CASE** (mrm) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Makita U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Makita Coporation for Makita U.S.A., Inc... (Williams Schnelker, Jessica) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Williams Schnelker on behalf of Makita U.S.A., Inc. (Williams Schnelker, Jessica) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4541639.) from Elkhart County Superior Court, Cause No. 20D05-2103-CT-000047, filed by Makita U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - SCA Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Mohammed Al Jakoush Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D - Letter to Makita - Sony Requesting Reimbursement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit E - Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams Schnelker, Jessica) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where MAKITA U.S.A. LNC. is a litigant