This case was last updated from PACER on 07/31/2021 at 08:27:48 (UTC).

American General Life Insurance Company v. Wounded Warrior Project, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 American General Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Wounded Warrior Project, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia Morales Howard and Monte C. Richardson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00564

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia Morales Howard

Referral Judge

Monte C. Richardson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American General Life Insurance Company

Defendants

Almavelez De Los Santos

Wounded Warrior Project, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Patrick Donahue

Attorney at Bressler, Amery & Ross, PC

2001 Park Place N Ste 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

Louis Frank Mendez

Attorney at Bressler, Amery & Ross, P.C.

2001 Park Place., Suite 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan W. Hayes

Attorney at Ausley McMullen

123 South Calhoun Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Sarah S. Butters

Attorney at Ausley McMullen

123 S. Calhoun St.

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

12 #5

Exhibit E - Email

12 #4

Exhibit D - Letter

12 #3

Exhibit C - Annual Report

12 #2

Exhibit B - Articles of Amendment

12 #1

Exhibit A - Articles of Incorporation

#12

(#12) NOTICE by American General Life Insurance Company re #9 Status Conference Regarding Citizenship of Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Articles of Incorporation, #2 Exhibit B - Articles of Amendment, #3 Exhibit C - Annual Report, #4 Exhibit D - Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Email)(Mendez, Louis) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wounded Warrior Project, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate WOUNDED WARRIOR PROJECT LT SUPPORT TRUST for Wounded Warrior Project, Inc... (Hayes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#10

(#10) INTERPLEADER CLAIM, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Wounded Warrior Project, Inc..(Hayes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#9

(#9) Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/17/2021. Notice regarding citizenship due July 2, 2021. Plaintiff shall deposit the funds at issue into the registry of the Court by July 2, 2021. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept that deposit. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H - October 26, 2020 Annuity Claimant Statement

1 #7

Exhibit G - July 25, 2019 Letter

1 #6

Exhibit F - November 6, 2012 Confirmation Letter

1 #5

Exhibit E - October 29, 2012 Service Request

1 #4

Exhibit D - March 16, 2009 Confirmation Letter

1 #3

Exhibit C - March 2, 2009 Service Request

1 #2

Exhibit B - Annuity Package

1 #1

Exhibit A - Application

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by American General Life Insurance Company re #9 Status Conference Regarding Citizenship of Parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Articles of Incorporation, #2 Exhibit B - Articles of Amendment, #3 Exhibit C - Annual Report, #4 Exhibit D - Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Email)(Mendez, Louis) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wounded Warrior Project, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate WOUNDED WARRIOR PROJECT LT SUPPORT TRUST for Wounded Warrior Project, Inc... (Hayes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INTERPLEADER CLAIM, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Wounded Warrior Project, Inc..(Hayes, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Judge Marcia Morales Howard: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/17/2021. Notice regarding citizenship due July 2, 2021. Plaintiff shall deposit the funds at issue into the registry of the Court by July 2, 2021. The Clerk of the Court is directed to accept that deposit. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (JW) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of service executed on 6/3/2021 by American General Life Insurance Company as to Wounded Warrior Project, Inc.. (Mendez, Louis) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Marcia Morales Howard. The hearing will be held by video teleconferencing using Zoom. The Courtroom Deputy Clerk will separately send participants the Zoom link. (JW) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Wounded Warrior Project, Inc. (BGR) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket(#4) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:21-cv-0564-MMH-MCR. (SJB) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by American General Life Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Mendez, Louis) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by American General Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AGC Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent SAFG Retirement Services, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Life Holdings, Inc. for American General Life Insurance Company.. (Mendez, Louis) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Interpleader Relief against Almavelez De Los Santos, Wounded Warrior Project, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18311526) filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Annuity Package, #3 Exhibit C - March 2, 2009 Service Request, #4 Exhibit D - March 16, 2009 Confirmation Letter, #5 Exhibit E - October 29, 2012 Service Request, #6 Exhibit F - November 6, 2012 Confirmation Letter, #7 Exhibit G - July 25, 2019 Letter, #8 Exhibit H - October 26, 2020 Annuity Claimant Statement, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons)(Mendez, Louis) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American General Life Insurance Company is a litigant