This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2021 at 06:41:54 (UTC).

American General Life Insurance Company v. Pettis et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 American General Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Pettis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas O. Rice. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00230

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas O. Rice

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American General Life Insurance Company

Defendants

David L Pettis

Estate of Peggy Pettis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rima Fawal Hartman

Attorney at Bressler Amery & Ross, PC

2001 Park Place, Suite 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Mail sent to David L Pettis, 1006 Harding St, Seminole, OK 74868 was returned as undeliverable re #8 Order to Deposit Funds into Court Registry and Denying Appointment of Special Administrator. (LMR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re American General Life Insurance Company. (Hartman, Rima) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#9

(#9) Mail sent to Elizabeth A Culp, 1006 Harding St., Seminole, OK 74868 was returned as undeliverable re #8 Order to Deposit Funds into Court Registry and Denying Appointment of Special Administrator. (LMR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Interpleader Deposit and denying #4 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued to David L Pettis. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#5

(#5) Civil Cover Sheet by American General Life Insurance Company. (Hartman, Rima) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

4 #4

Exhibit D

4 #3

Exhibit C

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

4 #4

Main Document

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American General Life Insurance Company. (Hartman, Rima) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Mail sent to David L Pettis, 1006 Harding St, Seminole, OK 74868 was returned as undeliverable re #8 Order to Deposit Funds into Court Registry and Denying Appointment of Special Administrator. (LMR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re American General Life Insurance Company. (Hartman, Rima) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket(#10) Interpleader Deposit Received (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $196,413.69, receipt SPO038731. (LTR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Mail sent to Elizabeth A Culp, 1006 Harding St., Seminole, OK 74868 was returned as undeliverable re #8 Order to Deposit Funds into Court Registry and Denying Appointment of Special Administrator. (LMR, Case Administrator) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Interpleader Deposit and denying #4 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Motion Hearing as to #3 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335), #4 MOTION to Appoint Custodian. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued to David L Pettis. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Civil Cover Sheet by American General Life Insurance Company. (Hartman, Rima) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appoint Custodian by American General Life Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2021 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge J Kelley Arnold Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hartman, Rima) Modified on 7/30/2021 to correct name of Judge (AY, Case Administrator). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by American General Life Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2021 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge J Kelley Arnold Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartman, Rima) Modified on 7/30/2021 to correct name of Judge (AY, Case Administrator). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American General Life Insurance Company. (Hartman, Rima) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # BWAEDC-3842632) Filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Hartman, Rima) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American General Life Insurance Company is a litigant