This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 09:39:02 (UTC).

American General Life Insurance Company v. One Vision et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2019 American General Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against One Vision. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly Mahoney, CJ Williams and Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03016

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CJ Williams

Referral Judges

Kelly Mahoney

Kelly K.E. Mahoney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American General Life Insurance Company

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Elizabeth Wilkinson

Sandy, UT 84093

Charles Marr

Whittier, CA 90602

Michael W Marr

Los Gatos, CA 95030

One Vision

Defendant and Cross Claimant

One Vision

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ethan S Olson

Attorney at Nyemaster Goode PC

625 First Street Se Ste 400, One Greatamerica Plaza, ***Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

Michael W Thrall

Attorney at Nyemaster Goode, P.C.

700 Walnut, Suite 1600, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309

Amy B Boyea

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

2000 E Lamar Boulevard, Suite 780, ***Ecf

Arlington, TX 76006

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

Collin Michael Davison

Attorney at Heiny McManigal Duffy Stambaugh & Anderson PLC

11 4Th Street Ne, Po Box 1567, Ecf

Mason City, IA 50402-1567

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) One Vision's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Charles Marr, Michael W Marr, Elizabeth Wilkinson by One Vision.(Davison, Collin) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by One Vision (Davison, Collin) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Collin Michael Davison on behalf of One Vision. (Davison, Collin) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

7 #1

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing Amy B. Boyea

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amy B. Boyea ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2955844) by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing Amy B. Boyea) (Olson, Ethan) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American General Life Insurance Company. One Vision waiver sent on 5/1/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Olson, Ethan) Modified text on 6/3/2019 (des) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) PRO SE ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Charles Marr, Michael W Marr, and Elizabeth Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to Answer) (NEF mailed to Dfts)(skm) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION to Deposit Funds Into Registry of the Court by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Olson, Ethan) Modified text and name of attachment on 4/24/2019 (des) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

3 #1

Redacted Exhibit B to Complaint

#3

(#3) SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM #1 Complaint by American General Life Insurance Company - Redacted Exhibit A to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibit B to Complaint) (Olson, Ethan) Modified text on 4/24/2019 (des) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

2 #1

Civil Actions new case packet

1 #4

Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #3

*Restricted*

1 #2

*Restricted*

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT In Interpleader against American General Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2925550) filed by American General Life Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 7/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Sealed Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Sealed Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Olson, Ethan) Modified text on 4/24/2019 (des) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) One Vision's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Charles Marr, Michael W Marr, Elizabeth Wilkinson by One Vision.(Davison, Collin) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by One Vision (Davison, Collin) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Collin Michael Davison on behalf of One Vision. (Davison, Collin) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amy B Boyea on behalf of Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company. Upon a review of the Motion and the Certificate of Good Standing, the court finds the Motion should be granted, on the condition attorney submits CM/ECF Registration Form by 6/24/2019. Signed by Clerk on 6/10/2019. (nef to Atty Boyea and non-ecf defts) (des) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amy B. Boyea ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2955844) by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing Amy B. Boyea) (Olson, Ethan) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American General Life Insurance Company. One Vision waiver sent on 5/1/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Olson, Ethan) Modified text on 6/3/2019 (des) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PRO SE ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Charles Marr, Michael W Marr, and Elizabeth Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to Answer) (NEF mailed to Dfts)(skm) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Deposit Funds Into Registry of the Court by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Olson, Ethan) Modified text and name of attachment on 4/24/2019 (des) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM #1 Complaint by American General Life Insurance Company - Redacted Exhibit A to Complaint (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibit B to Complaint) (Olson, Ethan) Modified text on 4/24/2019 (des) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Charles Marr, Michael W Marr, One Vision, Elizabeth Wilkinson. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Clerk checked for conflicts as to parties and attorneys Ethan Olson and Michael Thrall - none found. (des) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT In Interpleader against American General Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2925550) filed by American General Life Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 7/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Sealed Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Sealed Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Olson, Ethan) Modified text on 4/24/2019 (des) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.