This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/08/2020 at 16:16:36 (UTC).

American General Life Insurance Company v. O.H.M. et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 American General Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against O H M. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are William F. Jung and Christopher P. Tuite. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01581

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William F. Jung

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American General Life Insurance Company

Defendants

Lisa Maharajh

O.H.M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Louis Frank Mendez

Attorney at Bressler, Amery & Ross, P.C.

2001 Park Place., Suite 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

David Patrick Donahue

Attorney at Bressler, Amery & Ross, PC

2001 Park Place N Ste 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Michael J. Hoover

Attorney at Interpleader Law, LLC

9015 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70810

Joel J. Ewusiak

Attorney at Ewusiak Law, P.A.

6601 Memorial Hwy Ste 311

Tampa, FL 33615-4501

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#8

7 #1

Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Michael J. Hoover)

#7

#6

#4

1 #10

Proposed Summons

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/03/2020 by Lisa Maharajh(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dev-Anand A. Maharajh) as to Lisa Maharajh(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dev-Anand A. Maharajh). (Castillo, Marcus) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael Hoover, appearing on behalf of O.H.M. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA061507.) Related document: #7 Unopposed MOTION for Michael J. Hoover to appear pro hac vice . (JLD) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by O.H.M. (Hoover, Michael) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (BSN). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by O.H.M.(Hoover, Michael) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (BSN). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Defendant O.H.M. a/k/a O.H.S.'s Unopposed Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael J. Hoover. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 7/23/2020. (MJP) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Written designation and consent to act by Joel J. Ewusiak on behalf of O.H.M. Local Counsel: Joel Ewusiak. Non-Resident Counsel: Michael J. Hoover. (Ewusiak, Joel) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Michael J. Hoover to appear pro hac vice by O.H.M. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Michael J. Hoover))(Ewusiak, Joel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER of service returned executed on 7/20/2020 by American General Life Insurance Company as to O.H.M. (Mendez, Louis) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Lisa Maharajh(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dev-Anand A. Maharajh), Lisa Maharajh(in her individual capacity) and O.H.M. (CRH) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/14/2020. (SAO) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-1581-T-02CPT. (SJB) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Deposit Funds by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mendez, Louis) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Interpleader Relief against Lisa Maharajh(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dev-Anand A. Maharajh), Lisa Maharajh(in her Individual Capacity), O.H.M. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17044802) filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Proposed Summons)(Mendez, Louis) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OHM is a litigant

Latest cases where American General Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel Justus Ewusiak

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Hoover