This case was last updated from PACER on 08/22/2021 at 08:08:45 (UTC).

American General Life Insurance Company v. Marquez

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 American General Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Marquez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jose E. Martinez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-22307

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jose E. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American General Life Insurance Company

Defendant

Jackeline M. Marquez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Anthony Richardson

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1001 Fannin, Suite 2700

Houston, TX 77002

Lelia Maria Menendez Schleier

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

2385 N.W. Executive Center Drive, Ste 400

Boca Raton, FL 33431

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American General Life Insurance Company (Richardson, Jason) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by American General Life Insurance Company. Jackeline M. Marquez served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Menendez Schleier, Lelia) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by American General Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for American General Life Insurance Company (Menendez Schleier, Lelia) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lelia Maria Menendez Schleier on behalf of American General Life Insurance Company. Attorney Lelia Maria Menendez Schleier added to party American General Life Insurance Company(pty:pla). (Menendez Schleier, Lelia) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Jackeline M. Marquez. (mee) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American General Life Insurance Company (Richardson, Jason) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by American General Life Insurance Company. Jackeline M. Marquez served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (Menendez Schleier, Lelia) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by American General Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for American General Life Insurance Company (Menendez Schleier, Lelia) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lelia Maria Menendez Schleier on behalf of American General Life Insurance Company. Attorney Lelia Maria Menendez Schleier added to party American General Life Insurance Company(pty:pla). (Menendez Schleier, Lelia) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Jackeline M. Marquez. (mee) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jackeline M. Marquez. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14789868, filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Richardson, Jason) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American General Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Anthony Richardson