This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2021 at 08:20:04 (UTC).

American General Life Insurance Company v. Alexandri Erickson et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 American General Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Alexandri Erickson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01025

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American General Life Insurance Company

Defendants

Alexandria Erickson

Moreno Valley, CA 92553

Anna Lopez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick J Mulligan

Attorney at Bressler Amery and Ross PC

2001 Park Place Suite 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#18

(#18) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to ANNA LOPEZ. (yl) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

16 #1

Declaration Declaration of Patrick J. Mulligan

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 08/01/2021)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL re Answer to Complaint #12 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #13 on 7/20/21 filed by defendant Alexandria Erickson. (lom) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Alexandria Erickson. (lom) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint #1 ; with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Alexandria Erickson. (lom) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

11 #1

Exhibit A - Certified Mail Return Receipt

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Anna Lopez. (et) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Alexandria Erickson. (et) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company. (Mulligan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company. (Mulligan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company. (Mulligan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • Docket(#20) Text Only Entry - IN CHAMBERS by Judge John W. Holcomb: Notice Regarding Electronic Document Submission System for People Without Lawyers. People who are not represented by attorneys may now submit documents for filing through the Court's Electronic Document Submission System ("EDSS") instead of mailing or bringing documents to the Clerk's Office. EDSS is not the same as filing documents electronically in the Court's CM/ECF System. Registration is not required to use EDSS and you do not need a PACER account; only internet access and an e-mail address are required. Attorneys may not use EDSS to submit documents on behalf of their clients. To access EDSS and for additional information, visit the Court's website at https://apps.cacd.uscourts.gov/edss. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to ANNA LOPEZ. (yl) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docket(#17) DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to ANNA LOPEZ. (yl) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Anna Lopez filed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Patrick J. Mulligan) (Mulligan, Patrick) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 08/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL re Answer to Complaint #12 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #13 on 7/20/21 filed by defendant Alexandria Erickson. (lom) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Alexandria Erickson. (lom) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint #1 ; with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Alexandria Erickson. (lom) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company, upon Defendant Anna Lopez served on 6/28/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Anna Lopez, Self in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service by mail and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Mulligan, Patrick) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company, upon Defendant Alexandria Erickson served on 6/29/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alexandria Erickson, Self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Mulligan, Patrick) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Anna Lopez. (et) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Alexandria Erickson. (et) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company. (Mulligan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company. (Mulligan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company. (Mulligan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31489996 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application, #2 Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Exhibit C - October 2020 Change of Beneficiary Form, #4 Exhibit D - November 2020 Change of Beneficiary Form, #5 Exhibit E - Claimant Statement, #6 Exhibit F - Letter) (Attorney Patrick J Mulligan added to party American General Life Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Mulligan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American General Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick J. Mulligan(Designation Retained)