This case was last updated from PACER on 10/03/2020 at 09:10:27 (UTC).

American General Insurance Company v. Keon Ok Kim, et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 American General Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Keon Ok Kim. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gail J. Standish and John A. Kronstadt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-07008

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American General Insurance Company

Defendants

Keon Ok Kim

Does 1 to 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colleen Therese Flaherty

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

One Kaiser Plaza Suite 340

Oakland, CA 94612

Charan M Higbee

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1 Kaiser Plaza Suite 340

Oakland, CA 94612

Jodi Krystyn Swick

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1 Kaiser Plaza Suite 340

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Keon Ok Kim. (jp) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#8

(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff American General Insurance Company. (Higbee, Charan) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (pbl) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff American General Insurance Company, identifying AGC Life Insurance Company; AIG Life Holdings, Inc.; SAFG Retirement Services, Inc.; American International Group, Inc.. (Higbee, Charan) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff American General Insurance Company. (Higbee, Charan) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27490338 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff American General Insurance Company. (Attorney Jodi Krystyn Swick added to party American General Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Swick, Jodi) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Keon Ok Kim. (jp) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff American General Insurance Company. (Higbee, Charan) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (pbl) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff American General Insurance Company, identifying AGC Life Insurance Company; AIG Life Holdings, Inc.; SAFG Retirement Services, Inc.; American International Group, Inc.. (Higbee, Charan) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff American General Insurance Company. (Higbee, Charan) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27490338 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff American General Insurance Company. (Attorney Jodi Krystyn Swick added to party American General Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Swick, Jodi) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American General Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colleen Therese Flaherty

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charan M Higbee

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jodi Krystyn Swick