This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2019 at 07:21:09 (UTC).

AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS, INC. v. BONARD

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BONARD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joel Schneider and Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-18094

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joel Schneider

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS, INC.

Defendant

JARRETT BONARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN SPELLS KRAUSE

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Employee Confidentiality and Noncompetition Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit B - Employment Agreement

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Exhibit A - Employee Confidentiality and Noncompetition Agreement

5 #2

Exhibit B - Employment Agreement

5 #3

Certificate of Service

#6

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS, INC.. JARRETT BONARD waiver sent on 10/4/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (KRAUSE, JONATHAN) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against JARRETT BONARD, filed by AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employee Confidentiality and Noncompetition Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Employment Agreement, #3 Certificate of Service)(KRAUSE, JONATHAN) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days to amend its complaint. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/23/2019. (rss, ) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to JARRETT BONARD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/19/2019. (ssp, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KRAUSE, JONATHAN) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JARRETT BONARD ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9972483), filed by AMERICAN FURNITURE RENTALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employee Confidentiality and Non competition Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Employment Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cry, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less