This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2019 at 07:37:59 (UTC).

American Fidelity Assurance Company v. Moore et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 American Fidelity Assurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Moore. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00035

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Fidelity Assurance Company

Defendants

Ralph S. Lee II

Mary Ann Moore Masters

Doris McRae Moore

Lewis D. Moore, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leslie Lane Mize

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP

Glenlake One, Suite 200, 4140 Parklake Avenue

Raleigh, NC 27612

Defendant Attorney

Benton G. Sawrey

Attorney at Narron Wenzel, P.A.

102 South Third Street, P. O. Box 1567

Smithfield, NC 27577

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Service

#17

(#17) Affidavit of Service for Summons, Complaint, Appearance of Counsel, Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations filed by American Fidelity Assurance Company served on Lewi D. Moore Jr. on 03/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Service) (Mize, Leslie) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

16 #1

Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Service-Lewis D. Moore, Jr.

#16

(#16) *CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #17 * Notice filed by American Fidelity Assurance Company (Notice of Filing Affidavit of Service on Lewis D. Moore, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Service-Lewis D. Moore, Jr.) (Mize, Leslie) Modified on 4/2/2019 (Tripp, S.). (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#15

(#15) Financial Disclosure Statement by Mary Ann Moore Masters (Sawrey, Benton) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#14

(#14) Financial Disclosure Statement by Mary Ann Moore Masters (Sawrey, Benton) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#13

(#13) Financial Disclosure Statement by Doris McRae Moore (Sawrey, Benton) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#12

(#12) Financial Disclosure Statement by Doris McRae Moore (Sawrey, Benton) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#11

(#11) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 5/2/19. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/28/2019. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#10

(#10) Financial Disclosure Statement by Mary Ann Moore Masters, Doris McRae Moore (Sawrey, Benton) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Benton G. Sawrey on behalf of Mary Ann Moore Masters, Doris McRae Moore. (Sawrey, Benton) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Mary Ann Moore Masters, Doris McRae Moore. (Sawrey, Benton) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

1 #19

Exhibit S-Nov 28, 2018 correspondence

1 #18

Exhibit R-Nov 2, 2018 correspondence

1 #16

Exhibit P-Claimant's Statement

1 #15

Exhibit O-Apr 6, 2016 corresp 0741

1 #14

Exhibit N-Oct 20, 2015 corresp 0741

1 #4

Exhibit D-Req for Benef Change, 6083

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Affidavit of Service for Summons, Complaint, Appearance of Counsel, Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations filed by American Fidelity Assurance Company served on Lewi D. Moore Jr. on 03/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Service) (Mize, Leslie) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #16 Notice - other: Wrong event used. Counsel is directed to refile using the event "Affidavit of Service" located in the Service of Process category of civil filing events. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) *CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #17 * Notice filed by American Fidelity Assurance Company (Notice of Filing Affidavit of Service on Lewis D. Moore, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Service-Lewis D. Moore, Jr.) (Mize, Leslie) Modified on 4/2/2019 (Tripp, S.). (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Financial Disclosure Statement by Mary Ann Moore Masters (Sawrey, Benton) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Financial Disclosure Statement by Mary Ann Moore Masters (Sawrey, Benton) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Financial Disclosure Statement by Doris McRae Moore (Sawrey, Benton) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Financial Disclosure Statement by Doris McRae Moore (Sawrey, Benton) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 5/2/19. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/28/2019. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File correct Financial Disclosure Statement as to Mary Ann Moore Masters, Doris McRae Moore regarding #10 Financial Disclosure Statement. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. Counsel is directed to refile an individual disclosure statement for each defendant. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Financial Disclosure Statement by Mary Ann Moore Masters, Doris McRae Moore (Sawrey, Benton) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Benton G. Sawrey on behalf of Mary Ann Moore Masters, Doris McRae Moore. (Sawrey, Benton) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Mary Ann Moore Masters, Doris McRae Moore. (Sawrey, Benton) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by American Fidelity Assurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Doris Moore Return Receipt), #2 Exhibit B (Mary Ann Masters Return Receipt), #3 Exhibit C (Ralph S. Lee II Return Receipt)) (Mize, Leslie) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Ralph S. Lee II, Mary Ann Moore Masters, Doris McRae Moore, Lewis D. Moore, Jr. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Collins, S.) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice filed by American Fidelity Assurance Company regarding #1 Complaint,,,, (Proposed Summons). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Mize, Leslie) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by American Fidelity Assurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American Fidelity Corporation for American Fidelity Assurance Company. (Mize, Leslie) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Leslie Lane Mize on behalf of American Fidelity Assurance Company. (Mize, Leslie) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice filed by American Fidelity Assurance Company regarding #1 Complaint,,,, (Civil Cover Sheet). (Mize, Leslie) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4844709.), filed by American Fidelity Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Specimen Policy, #2 Exhibit B-App for Policy 6083, #3 Exhibit C-App for Policy 0741, #4 Exhibit D-Req for Benef Change, 6083, #5 Exhibit E-Req for Benef Change, 0741, #6 Exhibit F-Req for Ownership Txf 6083, #7 Exhibit G-Req for Ownership Txf 0741, #8 Exhibit H-March 17, 1992 correspondence, #9 Exhibit I-April 9, 1992 correspondence, #10 Exhibit J-Apr 9, 1992 correspondence, 0741, #11 Exhibit K-Req for beneficiary change, 6083, #12 Exhibit L-Req for beneficiary change, 0741, #13 Exhibit M-Oct 20, 2015 corresp 6083, #14 Exhibit N-Oct 20, 2015 corresp 0741, #15 Exhibit O-Apr 6, 2016 corresp 0741, #16 Exhibit P-Claimant's Statement, #17 Exhibit Q-Sept 11, 2018 correspondence, #18 Exhibit R-Nov 2, 2018 correspondence, #19 Exhibit S-Nov 28, 2018 correspondence) (Mize, Leslie) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Fidelity Assurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leslie Lane Mize