This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2021 at 10:58:33 (UTC).

American Federation of Teachers Mississippi et al v. Weingarten et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 American Federation of Teachers Mississippi filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Weingarten. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel P. Jordan, III and F. Keith Ball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00244

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel P. Jordan, III

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

American Federation of Teachers Mississippi

Geraldine Bender

Defendants

Jackson Federation of Teachers and PSRP

Loretta Johnson

John Does 1-10

Akemi Stout

Randi Weingarten

American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen W. Dummer

Attorney at DUMMER LAW GROUP, PLLC

796 Howard Avenue, First Floor

Biloxi, MS 39530

 

Court Documents

#4

#3

2 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1 - "Exhibit D for Complaint"

#2

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit L - AFT Constitution (unmarked)

1 #11

Exhibit K - AFT MS Constitution (Unmarked)

1 #10

Exhibit J - JFT Constitution (Unmarked)

1 #9

Exhibit I - Ltr to Washington 8-11-2020

1 #8

Exhibit H - Bender Ltr to AFT Exc 8-7-2020

1 #7

Exhibit G - Jackson FT Workout Agreement 6-18-2020

1 #6

Exhibit F - AFT MS Response to RFA 5-14-2020

1 #5

Exhibit E - AFT-MS Ltr to AFT 4-28-2020

1 #4

Exhibit D - to be filed under seal

1 #3

Exhibit C - Ltr to Dummer from Mullinex

1 #2

Exhibit B - Ltr from JFT 5-24-2019

1 #1

Exhibit A - Ltr to Stout 5-9-2019

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to American Federation of Teachers, AFL-CIO, Jackson Federation of Teachers and PSRP, Loretta Johnson, Akemi Stout, Randi Weingarten. (KNS) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER temporarily granting #2 Motion to File Under Seal an Exhibit Containing Potentially Confidential Financial Information of a Named Defendant. Plaintiff may file the Management Report, Exhibit "D" to the Complaint #1 , under seal with access restricted to the Court and the parties, and the exhibit is to remain sealed until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 4/28/2021. (dcw) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) First MOTION to File Under Seal an Exhibit Containing Potentially Confidential Financial Information of a Named Defendant re #1 Complaint,,, by American Federation of Teachers Mississippi, Geraldine Bender (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - "Exhibit D for Complaint")(Dummer, Stephen) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jackson Federation of Teachers and PSRP, John Does 1-10, Loretta Johnson, Akemi Stout, Randi Weingarten ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4527385), filed by American Federation of Teachers Mississippi, Geraldine Bender. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ltr to Stout 5-9-2019, #2 Exhibit B - Ltr from JFT 5-24-2019, #3 Exhibit C - Ltr to Dummer from Mullinex, #4 Exhibit D - to be filed under seal, #5 Exhibit E - AFT-MS Ltr to AFT 4-28-2020, #6 Exhibit F - AFT MS Response to RFA 5-14-2020, #7 Exhibit G - Jackson FT Workout Agreement 6-18-2020, #8 Exhibit H - Bender Ltr to AFT Exc 8-7-2020, #9 Exhibit I - Ltr to Washington 8-11-2020, #10 Exhibit J - JFT Constitution (Unmarked), #11 Exhibit K - AFT MS Constitution (Unmarked), #12 Exhibit L - AFT Constitution (unmarked), #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen W. Dummer