This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2021 at 19:27:53 (UTC).

AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY & MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO v. PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO filed an Other lawsuit against PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher R. Cooper and Paul L. Friedman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-MC-00133

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Christopher R. Cooper

Paul L. Friedman

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY & MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO

Respondents

PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND

PROJECT VERITAS

JAMES O'KEEFE

ALLISON MAASS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kathleen M. Keller

Attorney at BREDHOFF & KAISER, PLLC

805 15Th Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Respondent Attorney

Stephen R. Klein

Attorney at BARR & KLEIN PLLC

1629 K Street Nw, Ste. 300

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibits

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY & MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO. Case related to Case No. 17cv1047. (znmw) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Klein on behalf of All Defendants (Klein, Stephen) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Exhibit A

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #3

Exhibit C

4 #4

Exhibit D

4 #5

Exhibit E

4 #6

Exhibit F

4 #7

Text of Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Petitioner American Federation of State, County, & Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO has filed a non-party motion to quash subpoenas for trial testimony in Democracy Partners, et al. v. Project Veritas Action Fund, et al., Civil Action No. 17-1047. The subpoenas relate to the trial that was scheduled to begin on December 6, 2021. On November 11, 2021, the Court granted the unopposed motion of defendants Project Veritas, et al., to vacate that trial date. Because the trial in Civil Action No. 17-1047 is no longer scheduled to proceed the week of December 6, 2021, #1 Petitioner's Motion to Quash Subpoenas for Trial Testimony is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 12, 2021. (lcaa) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Memorandum in opposition to re #1 MOTION TO QUASH (Filing fee $ 49, receipt number TBD) filed by ALLISON MAASS, JAMES O'KEEFE, PROJECT VERITAS, PROJECT VERITAS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Stephen) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCase directly reassigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman as related. Judge Christopher R. Cooper is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Civil Rules 40.5(a)(3) and (c)(2), and with the consent of Judge Friedman, the Clerk of Court is hereby directed to transfer this case to the Calendar Committee for reassignment to Judge Friedman as related to Democracy Partners LLC et al. v. Project Veritas Action Fund et al., No. 17-cv-01047-PLF. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/27/2021. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Klein on behalf of All Defendants (Klein, Stephen) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY & MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO. Case related to Case No. 17cv1047. (znmw) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION TO QUASH Subpoenas for Trial Testimony (Filing fee $ 49, receipt number 200848) filed by AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY & MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(znmw) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Project Veritas Action Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES LOCAL 619 DISTRICT COUNCIL 36 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Ralph Klein