This case was last updated from PACER on 06/08/2020 at 18:18:04 (UTC).

American Federation of Government Employees v. U.S. Dept of Veteran Affairs

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 American Federation of Government Employees filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against U S Dept of Veteran Affairs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00070

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338

1901 Sunset Drive, Suite 209

Poplar Bluff, MO 673901

Defendants

U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, John J. Pershing Medical Center

Poplar Bluff, MO 63901

Robert L Wilkie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Lee Smith

Attorney at ROBERT L SMITH LLC

502 Vine Street, Suite 2

Poplar Bluff, MO 63901

 

Court Documents

6 #2

Attachment

6 #1

Attachment

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Robert L Wilkie Amendment to #1 Complaint, 3 Summons(es) issued,, filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(MRS) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

5 #1

Summons VA Medical

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to defendant U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, John J. Pershing Medical Center, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was emailed to Robert Smith. (Attachments: #1 Summons VA Medical)(MRS) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE Summons: by Plaintiff American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338 (Smith, Robert) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE Summons: by Plaintiff American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338 (Smith, Robert) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

2 #1

Attachment Receipt of Service

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338. Defendant All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Receipt of Service)(Smith, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

1 #4

Summons Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit FLRA Decision

1 #1

Exhibit Arbitration Award

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT 1:20-cv-00070 against defendant U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, John J. Pershing Medical Center with receipt number AMOEDC-7858366, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit FLRA Decision, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons)(Smith, Robert) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Robert L Wilkie Amendment to #1 Complaint, 3 Summons(es) issued,, filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(MRS) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to defendant U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, John J. Pershing Medical Center, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was emailed to Robert Smith. (Attachments: #1 Summons VA Medical)(MRS) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE Summons: by Plaintiff American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338 (Smith, Robert) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE Summons: by Plaintiff American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338 (Smith, Robert) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338. Defendant All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Receipt of Service)(Smith, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 1 @ 60 days Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Robert Smith. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MRS) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT 1:20-cv-00070 against defendant U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, John J. Pershing Medical Center with receipt number AMOEDC-7858366, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit FLRA Decision, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons)(Smith, Robert) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less