This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 08:44:46 (UTC).

American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. Solubon Ltd

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Solubon Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul G. Gardephe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06629

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Gardephe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company

Defendant

Solubon Ltd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Maureen Elizabeth O'Connor

Attorney at L'Abbate Balkin Colavita & Contini, LLP

1001 Franklin Avenue

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Solubon Ltd.(km) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#10

(#10) AFFIRMATION of Maureen E. O'Connor in Support re: #9 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

8 #1

Certificate of Default - Proposed

#8

(#8) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Default - Proposed).(O'Connor, Maureen) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 10/9/2020 (km). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Solubon Ltd served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent, NY Secretary of State. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Per the SDNY COVID-19 COURTHOUSE ENTRY PROGRAM, anyone who appears at any SDNY courthouse must complete a questionnaire and have their temperature taken. Please see the instructions, attached below. Completing the questionnaire ahead of time will save time and effort upon entry. Only those individuals who meet the entry requirements established by the questionnaire will be permitted entry. Please contact chambers if you do not meet the requirements. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/20/2020) (jca) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Solubon Ltd..(pne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Group for American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SOLUBON LTD., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Solubon Ltd. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21226423)Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Solubon Ltd.(km) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIRMATION of Maureen E. O'Connor in Support re: #9 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Maureen O'Connor. RE-FILE Document No. #8 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the clerk's certificate needs to be filed as a separate entry (filed under proposed orders, proposed clerk's certificate of default). The affirmation in support also needs to be filed separately (filed under other answers, affirmation in support of a non-motion). (km) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Default - Proposed).(O'Connor, Maureen) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 10/9/2020 (km). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Solubon Ltd served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent, NY Secretary of State. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Per the SDNY COVID-19 COURTHOUSE ENTRY PROGRAM, anyone who appears at any SDNY courthouse must complete a questionnaire and have their temperature taken. Please see the instructions, attached below. Completing the questionnaire ahead of time will save time and effort upon entry. Only those individuals who meet the entry requirements established by the questionnaire will be permitted entry. Please contact chambers if you do not meet the requirements. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/20/2020) (jca) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Solubon Ltd..(pne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Group for American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SOLUBON LTD., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Solubon Ltd. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21226423)Document filed by American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company..(O'Connor, Maureen) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less