This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2020 at 08:59:54 (UTC).

American Eagle Entertainment LLC v. Athena Enterprises, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 American Eagle Entertainment LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Athena Enterprises, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nina Y. Wang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02743

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nina Y. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

American Eagle Entertainment, LLC

American Eagle Entertainment LLC

Defendants

Athena Enterprises, LLC t/a My Place

Carmella Russo

Athena Enterprises, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Carl Groh, III

Attorney at Thomas P. Howard LLC

842 West South Boulder Road, Suite 100

Louisville, CO 80027

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) (ANSWER) AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Carmella Russo. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #7 Order, 8 Minute Order, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff American Eagle Entertainment LLC. (Groh, William) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/11/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 10/26/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/2/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/9/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2743-NYW (angar, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#4

(#4) Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

3 #2

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Athena Enterprises, LLC t/a My Place, Carmella Russo (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7479102)Attorney William Carl Groh, III added to party American Eagle Entertainment, LLC(pty:pla), filed by American Eagle Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Groh, William) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) (ANSWER) AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Carmella Russo. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/21/2020. Defendants Athena Enterprises, LLC and Carmella Russo shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 11/4/2020. Furthermore, the Consent Form is now due by 11/16/2020; the Proposed Scheduling Order is due by 11/23/2020; and the Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 11/30/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #7 Order, 8 Minute Order, #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff American Eagle Entertainment LLC. (Groh, William) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/9/2020. Due to an unavoidable scheduling conflict, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 2:30 PM is hereby RESET in time only to 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, ) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/11/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 10/26/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/2/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/9/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2743-NYW (angar, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Athena Enterprises, LLC t/a My Place, Carmella Russo (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7479102)Attorney William Carl Groh, III added to party American Eagle Entertainment, LLC(pty:pla), filed by American Eagle Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Groh, William) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less