This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2022 at 07:23:29 (UTC).

American Contractors Ins. Co., RRG v. Financial Pacific Ins. Co.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 American Contractors Ins Co , RRG filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Financial Pacific Ins Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Troy L. Nunley and Kendall J. Newman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00228

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Troy L. Nunley

Referral Judge

Kendall J. Newman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Contractors Insurance Company, RRG

Defendant

Financial Pacific Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert V. Closson

Attorney at Hirsch Closson, APLC

5030 Camino De La Siesta, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92108

Bryan Padrigh Kerney

Attorney at Hirsch Closson, APLC

26346 Carmel Rancho Lane, Suite 201-C

Carmel, CA 93923

Defendant Attorney

Aparajito Sen

Attorney at Ford, Walker, Haggerty & Behar

One World Trade Center, 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90831

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Subcontract

1 #2

Exhibit Underlying Action Complaint

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Financial Pacific Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert V. Closson* *Hirsch Closson, APLC* *5030 Camino de la Siesta, Suite 300* *San Diego, California 92108*. (Reader, L) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Consent Form

3 #2

VDRP

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by American Contractors Insurance Company, RRG. (Closson, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Financial Pacific Insurance Company served on 2/9/22. (Closson, Robert) Modified on 2/23/2022 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bryan Padrigh Kerney on behalf of American Contractors Insurance Company, RRG. Attorney Kerney, Bryan Padrigh added. (Kerney, Bryan) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bryan Padrigh Kerney on behalf of American Contractors Insurance Company, RRG. (Kerney, Bryan) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Not More Than 30 Days by Financial Pacific Insurance Company. Attorney Sen, Aparajito added. (Sen, Aparajito) Modified on 3/4/2022 (Zignago, K.). (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Financial Pacific Insurance Company. (Sen, Aparajito) Modified on 3/21/2022 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#10

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Financial Pacific Insurance Company.(Sen, Aparajito) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Financial Pacific Insurance Company.(Sen, Aparajito) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kerney, Bryan) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Financial Pacific Insurance Company. (Sen, Aparajito) Modified on 3/21/2022 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Not More Than 30 Days by Financial Pacific Insurance Company. Attorney Sen, Aparajito added. (Sen, Aparajito) Modified on 3/4/2022 (Zignago, K.). (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bryan Padrigh Kerney on behalf of American Contractors Insurance Company, RRG. (Kerney, Bryan) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bryan Padrigh Kerney on behalf of American Contractors Insurance Company, RRG. Attorney Kerney, Bryan Padrigh added. (Kerney, Bryan) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Financial Pacific Insurance Company served on 2/9/22. (Closson, Robert) Modified on 2/23/2022 (Kaminski, H). (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by American Contractors Insurance Company, RRG. (Closson, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Reader, L) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Financial Pacific Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert V. Closson* *Hirsch Closson, APLC* *5030 Camino de la Siesta, Suite 300* *San Diego, California 92108*. (Reader, L) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Financial Pacific Insurance Company by American Contractors Insurance Company, RRG. Attorney Closson, Robert V. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10057658) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subcontract, #2 Exhibit Underlying Action Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Closson, Robert) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Contractors Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where FINANCIAL PACIFIC INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant