This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:54:32 (UTC).

American Clothing Express, Inc. et al v. CloudFlare, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 American Clothing Express, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against CloudFlare, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Diane K. Vescovo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02007

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Samuel H. Mays, Jr

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

American Clothing Express, Inc.

Justin Alexander, Inc.

Defendants

Does 1-200

CloudFlare, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Grady M. Garrison

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ, P.C.

165 Madison Ave., Ste. 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

Nicole D. Berkowitz

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ

165 Madison Ave., Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

Stuart Kagen

Attorney at KAGEN & CASPERSEN PLLC

757 3Rd Ave., 20Th Fl.

New York, NY 10017

Russell L. Bogart

Attorney at KAGEN & CASPERSEN PLLC

757 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor, New York

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorney

Robb S. Harvey

Attorney at WALLER LANSDEN DORTCH & DAVIS LLP

511 Union Street, Suite 2700

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

1 #20

Exhibit 5 - Part 15

#16

(#16) Summons Reissued as to CloudFlare, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

19 #1

Supplement Proposed Order

#19

(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by CloudFlare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Harvey, Robb) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

1 #15

Exhibit 5 - Part 10

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Summons by Nicole D. Berkowitz on behalf of American Clothing Express, Inc., Justin Alexander, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Alias Summons (PLEASE ISSUE FOR PRIVATE PROCESS SERVICE))(Berkowitz, Nicole) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Robb S. Harvey on behalf of CloudFlare, Inc. (Harvey, Robb) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

1 #22

Exhibit 5 - Part 17

#17

(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Clothing Express, Inc., Justin Alexander, Inc. as to CloudFlare, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Nicole) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stuart Kagen. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 01/21/2020. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

1 #31

Civil Cover Sheet

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant CloudFlare, Inc.'s answer is due 3/20/2020. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 02/10/2020. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

1 #21

Exhibit 5 - Part 16

1 #19

Exhibit 5 - Part 14

1 #8

Exhibit 5 - Part 3

15 #1

Exhibit A-Alias Summons (PLEASE ISSUE FOR PRIVATE PROCESS SERVICE)

1 #32

Summons

1 #25

Exhibit 5 - Part 20

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant CloudFlare, Inc.'s answer is due 3/20/2020. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 02/10/2020. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by CloudFlare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Order)(Harvey, Robb) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Robb S. Harvey on behalf of CloudFlare, Inc. (Harvey, Robb) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Clothing Express, Inc., Justin Alexander, Inc. as to CloudFlare, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Nicole) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Summons Reissued as to CloudFlare, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Summons by Nicole D. Berkowitz on behalf of American Clothing Express, Inc., Justin Alexander, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Alias Summons (PLEASE ISSUE FOR PRIVATE PROCESS SERVICE))(Berkowitz, Nicole) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stuart Kagen. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 01/21/2020. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Russell Bogart. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 01/21/2020. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3263423) filed by American Clothing Express, Inc., Justin Alexander, Inc., #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number BTNWDC-3263143) filed by American Clothing Express, Inc., Justin Alexander, Inc. has been filed. Please note "Wet Signtures". Please see ECF Polices and Procedures 10.1 Electronic Signature.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jld) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3263423) by American Clothing Express, Inc., Justin Alexander, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (SDNY), #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (California), #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (New York))(Kagen, Stuart) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number BTNWDC-3263143) by American Clothing Express, Inc., Justin Alexander, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (SDNY), #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (District of Columbia), #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (New York))(Bogart, Russell) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Clothing Express, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Nicole) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Justin Alexander, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Nicole) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Grady M. Garrison on behalf of American Clothing Express, Inc., Justin Alexander, Inc. (Garrison, Grady) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to CloudFlare, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Direct and Contributory Copyright Infringement against CloudFlare, Inc., Does 1-200 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3250840), filed by American Clothing Express, Inc. d/b/a Allure Bridals, Justin Alexander, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5 - Part 1, #7 Exhibit 5 - Part 2, #8 Exhibit 5 - Part 3, #9 Exhibit 5 - Part 4, #10 Exhibit 5 - Part 5, #11 Exhibit 5 - Part 6, #12 Exhibit 5 - Part 7, #13 Exhibit 5 - Part 8, #14 Exhibit 5 - Part 9, #15 Exhibit 5 - Part 10, #16 Exhibit 5 - Part 11, #17 Exhibit 5 - Part 12, #18 Exhibit 5 - Part 13, #19 Exhibit 5 - Part 14, #20 Exhibit 5 - Part 15, #21 Exhibit 5 - Part 16, #22 Exhibit 5 - Part 17, #23 Exhibit 5 - Part 18, #24 Exhibit 5 - Part 19, #25 Exhibit 5 - Part 20, #26 Exhibit 5 - Part 21, #27 Exhibit 5 - Part 22, #28 Exhibit 5 - Part 23, #29 Exhibit 5 - Part 24, #30 Exhibit 5 - Part 25, #31 Civil Cover Sheet, #32 Summons)(Berkowitz, Nicole) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.