This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2022 at 08:45:18 (UTC).

American Casualty Company et al v. Lighthouse Safety et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 American Casualty Company filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Lighthouse Safety. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daphne A. Oberg, David Barlow and Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00301

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dustin B. Pead

Presiding Judges

Daphne A. Oberg

David Barlow

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

American Casualty Company

Continental Insurance Company

Defendants

Lighthouse Safety

Reliance Industries

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

S. Spencer Brown

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Jack D. Smart

Attorney at STRONG & HANNI

102 S 200 E Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremy S. Stuart

Attorney at SNOW CHRISTENSEN & MARTINEAU

10 Exchange Place 11Th Fl, Po Box 45000

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-5000

Steven R. Glauser

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Bryson Ray Brown

Attorney at SNOW CHRISTENSEN & MARTINEAU

10 Exchange Place 11Th Fl, Po Box 45000

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-5000

Austin Bybee

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/2/2023. Motions due by 8/30/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge David Barlow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 06/06/2022. (jl) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

22 #1

Text of Proposed Order

22 #22

Main Document

21 #2

Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint and Return of Service of the Summons issued to

21 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint and Return of Service of the Summons issued to

21 #21

Main Document

#20

(#20) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Reliance Industries identifying W. Joe Shaw, Ltd. dba goSafe as Corporate Parent. (Glauser, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #3 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

5 #3

Exhibit C - Fourth District Court Docket

5 #2

Exhibit B - Summons to Reliance Industries

5 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint Filed in Fourth District Court, State of Utah

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs American Casualty Company, Continental Insurance Company, Defendants Lighthouse Safety, Reliance Industries. (mh) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#3

(#14) NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #3 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Defendants Lighthouse Safety, Reliance Industries are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/2/2023. Motions due by 8/30/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rm 8.100 before Judge David Barlow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 06/06/2022. (jl) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, S.) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF FILING of Certification of All Documents Filed in the State Court Action re 19 Order, filed by Defendant Reliance Industries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint and Return of Service of the Summons issued to Defendant Lighthouse Safety, LLC, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint and Return of Service of the Summons issued to Defendant Reliance Industries, Inc.)(Glauser, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Reliance Industries identifying W. Joe Shaw, Ltd. dba goSafe as Corporate Parent. (Glauser, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • Docket(#19) DOCKET TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(a) and Local Rule of Practice DUCivR 81-2, the removing party must certify that a copy of all process, pleadings, and orders served or entered in the state court action have been filed in this case. The certification must be filed by June 1, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 05/25/2022. (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A). Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 05/24/2022. (dah) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docket(#17) All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge David Barlow. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to the case. (alf) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docket(#16) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Lighthouse Safety. (alf) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docket(#15) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs American Casualty Company, Continental Insurance Company. (alf) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #3 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment,, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Stuart on behalf of Lighthouse Safety (Stuart, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) filed by Reliance Industries. (Glauser, Steven) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Steven Glauser seeks to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Lighthouse Safety, LLC ("Lighthouse"), stating he has not been retained to represent Lighthouse, the prior filing indicating he represented Lighthouse was in error, and Lighthouse is represented by other counsel. However, no other counsel has entered an appearance on behalf of Lighthouse; therefore, Mr. Glauser's withdrawal would leave Lighthouse without counsel in this action. Mr. Glauser's motion does not comply with the local rule governing attorney withdrawal when the party will be left without representation. See DUCivR 83-1.4(c) (requiring, among other things, certification that the motion was sent to the moving attorney's client). Mr. Glauser may file a new motion which complies with DUCivR 83-1.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/6/2022. No attached document. (med) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen (14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 5/4/22. (alf) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Defendant Reliance Industries. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glauser, Steven) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING of of State Court Documents re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Defendant Reliance Industries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint Filed in Fourth District Court, State of Utah, #2 Exhibit B - Summons to Reliance Industries, #3 Exhibit C - Fourth District Court Docket)(Glauser, Steven) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs American Casualty Company, Continental Insurance Company, Defendants Lighthouse Safety, Reliance Industries. (mh) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs American Casualty Company, Continental Insurance Company, Defendants Lighthouse Safety, Reliance Industries. Form due by 5/19/2022. (alf) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 4th District Court, Utah County, case number 220400353, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4323967) filed by Lighthouse Safety, Reliance Industries. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Glauser, Steven) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Defendants Lighthouse Safety, Reliance Industries are directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania is a litigant

Latest cases where The Continental Insurance Company is a litigant