This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2021 at 08:37:41 (UTC).

American Builders Insurance Company et al v. Robert Castellano Building & Design, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 American Builders Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Robert Castellano Building Design, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-61199

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

National Builders Insurance Company

American Builders Insurance Company

Defendants

Richard McKenzie

J.W., as a minor, by and through Tracy Winters & Rob Winters

ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest

Barbara Hollinger

Robert Castellano

Robert Castellano Building & Design LLC

Robert Castellano Building & Design, LLC

J.W., a minor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rebecca C. Appelbaum

Attorney at Gartner&Bloom PC

1101 E Cumberland Avesuite 201H-153

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

Jon Dale Derrevere

Attorney at Derrevere Stevens Black & Cozad

2005 Vista Parkwaysuite 210

West Palm Beach, FL 33411

 

Court Documents

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgement by ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Derrevere, Jon) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon Dale Derrevere on behalf of ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest. Attorney Jon Dale Derrevere added to party ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest(pty:dft). (Derrevere, Jon) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to J.W., a minor. (cds) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) JW, a Minor by and through Tracy Winters and Rob Winters by American Builders Insurance Company, National Builders Insurance Company re #1 Complaint,,,, filed by American Builders Insurance Company, National Builders Insurance Company (Appelbaum, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by National Builders Insurance Company, American Builders Insurance Company. ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest served on 6/15/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Appelbaum, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Broward (Office - Ft Lauderdale) as the county by Complaint. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (cds) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest, Robert Castellano, Barbara Hollinger, J.W., a minor, Richard McKenzie, Robert Castellano Building & Design, LLC. (cds) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgement against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14750429, filed by National Builders Insurance Company, American Builders Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wallice Policy 0155158-03, #2 Exhibit Wallice Policy 0155210-03, #3 Exhibit NBIC Policy 0117055-04, #4 Exhibit Castellano Policy 2016-2017, #5 Exhibit ACE First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Stip for Entry of Final Consent, #7 Exhibit Castellano Settlement Agreement, #8 Exhibit Notice of Forfeiture of Coverage to RCBD, #9 Exhibit Hollinger Complaint, #10 Exhibit Winters Complaint, #11 Exhibit Reservation of Rights - BI Lawsuits, #12 Exhibit Reservation of Rights - Hollinger case, #13 Exhibit Supplemental ROR - Hollinger case, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Summon(s) Summons to ACE Insurance Company, #16 Summon(s) Summons to Barbara Hollinger, #17 Summon(s) Summons to JW, #18 Summon(s) Summons to Robert Castellano Building & Design, #19 Summon(s) Summons to Robert Castellano, #20 Summon(s) Summons to Richard McKenzie)(Appelbaum, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Builders Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN BUILDERS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon Dale Derrevere