This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2019 at 07:50:03 (UTC).

American Atheists Inc et al v. Rapert

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 American Atheists Inc filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Rapert. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00017

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

American Atheists Inc

Betty Jo Fernau

Catherine Shoshone

Robert Barringer

Karen Dempsey

Defendant

Stanley Jason Rapert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Geoffrey T. Blackwell

Attorney at American Atheists, Inc.

718 Seventh Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Philip E. Kaplan

Attorney at Williams & Anderson, PLC

111 Center Street, Suite 2200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2413

Bonnie Joan Johnson

Attorney at Williams & Anderson, PLC

111 Center Street, Suite 2200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2413

Defendant Attorneys

Dylan L. Jacobs

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

Nicholas Jacob Bronni

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

John Paul Byrd

Attorney at Paul Byrd Law Firm, PLLC

415 North Mckinley Street, Suite 210

Little Rock, AR 72205

William C. Bird, III

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

 

Court Documents

#26

25 #3

Exhibit C

25 #2

Exhibit B

25 #1

Exhibit A

#25

24 #1

Exhibit A: Reply Brief

#24

22 #1

Exhibit 1 Reply Brief

#22

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Main Document - Correct (submitted 1/9/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply filed by Stanley Jason Rapert. (Byrd, John) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply filed by Stanley Jason Rapert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Leave to File a Reply by Stanley Jason Rapert (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Reply Brief)(Byrd, John) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #17 motion for admission pro hac vice; and admitting Mr. Geoffrey T. Blackwell pro hac vice. Mr. Blackwell shall appear as counsel for plaintiffs along with plaintiffs' Arkansas counsel, Philip E. Kaplan. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/4/2019. (kdr) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Leave to File a Reply by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Reply Brief)(Kaplan, Philip) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Stanley Jason Rapert.(Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kaplan, Philip) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Hearing re #1 Complaint, filed by Stanley Jason Rapert. (Byrd, John) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Hearing re #1 Complaint, filed by Stanley Jason Rapert. (Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Geoffrey T. Blackwell. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3388965. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kaplan, Philip) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Byrd on behalf of Stanley Jason Rapert (Byrd, John) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Bird, III on behalf of Stanley Jason Rapert (Bird, William) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing regarding #5 plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction and request for expedited hearing on Tuesday, 1/15/2019, beginning at 9:00 a.m. C.T. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/10/2019. (cmn) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Hearing re #1 Complaint, , #1 Complaint, #6 Brief in Support Service by American Atheists Inc, Robert Barringer, Karen Dempsey, Betty Jo Fernau, Catherine Shoshone. (Kaplan, Philip) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion to Expedite, Motion for Hearing filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kaplan, Philip) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (), MOTION to Expedite , MOTION for Hearing re #1 Complaint, by All Plaintiffs (Kaplan, Philip) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Jacob Bronni on behalf of Stanley Jason Rapert (Bronni, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan L. Jacobs on behalf of Stanley Jason Rapert (Jacobs, Dylan) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: A more legible image file was added as an attachment to docket entry #1 based on the attached correspondence. (cmn) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief, Injunctive Relief, Nominal Damages, and Punitive Damages with Jury Demand filed by American Atheists Inc, Catherine Shoshone, Robert Barringer, Karen Dempsey, Betty Jo Fernau against Stanley Jason Rapert. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT070358. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2019: #2 Main Document - Correct) (cmn). (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Atheists is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William C. Bird, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Jacob Bronni