This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2019 at 07:04:25 (UTC).

American Airlines Federal Credit Union v. Sonic Corp et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 American Airlines Federal Credit Union filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Sonic Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Goodwin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00208

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Goodwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Airlines Federal Credit Union

Defendants

Sonic Restaurants Inc

Sonic Capital LLC

Sonic Franchising LLC

Sonic Corp

Sonic Industries Inc

Sonic Industries LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David B Donchin

Attorney at Durbin Larimore & Bialick

920 N Harvey Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-2610

Carey Alexander

Attorney at Scott & Scott Attorneys at Law LLP

The Helmsley Bldg, 230 Park Ave, 17Th Fl

New York, NY 10169

Michael J Laird

Attorney at Zimmerman Reed LLP

1100 Ids Center, 80 South 8Th St

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Brian C Gudmundson

Attorney at Zimmerman Reed LLP

1100 Ids Center, 80 South 8Th St

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Erin G Comite

Attorney at Scott & Scott Attorneys at Law-LLP COLCHESTER

156 South Main Street, Po Box 192

Colchester, CT 06415

Joseph P Guglielmo

Attorney at Scott & Scott Attorneys at Law LLP

The Helmsley Bldg, 230 Park Ave, 17Th Fl

New York, NY 10169

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ENTRY of Appearance by Carey Alexander on behalf of American Airlines Federal Credit Union (Alexander, Carey) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#18

(#18) ENTRY of Appearance by Erin G Comite on behalf of American Airlines Federal Credit Union (Comite, Erin) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#17

(#17) ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph P Guglielmo on behalf of American Airlines Federal Credit Union (Guglielmo, Joseph) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#16

(#16) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J Laird on behalf of American Airlines Federal Credit Union (Laird, Michael) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#15

(#15) ENTRY of Appearance by Brian C Gudmundson on behalf of American Airlines Federal Credit Union (Gudmundson, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Laird shall register to file documents electronically in this district on or before April 1, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/11/2019. (jb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Gumundson shall register to file documents electronically in this district on or before April 1, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/11/2019. (jb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Alexander shall register to file documents electronically in this district on or before April 1, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/11/2019. (jb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Comite shall register to file documents electronically in this district on or before April 1, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/11/2019. (jb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission PHV

#6

(#11) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Comite shall register to file documents electronically in this district on or before April 1, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/11/2019. (jb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission PHV

#5

(#10) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Alexander shall register to file documents electronically in this district on or before April 1, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/11/2019. (jb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by American Airlines Federal Credit Union . (Donchin, David) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by David B Donchin on behalf of American Airlines Federal Credit Union (Donchin, David) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Sonic Capital LLC, Sonic Corp, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Restaurants Inc. (kmt) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sonic Capital LLC, Sonic Corp, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries Inc, Sonic Restaurants Inc filed by American Airlines Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ENTRY of Appearance by Carey Alexander on behalf of American Airlines Federal Credit Union (Alexander, Carey) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ENTRY of Appearance by Erin G Comite on behalf of American Airlines Federal Credit Union (Comite, Erin) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph P Guglielmo on behalf of American Airlines Federal Credit Union (Guglielmo, Joseph) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J Laird on behalf of American Airlines Federal Credit Union (Laird, Michael) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ENTRY of Appearance by Brian C Gudmundson on behalf of American Airlines Federal Credit Union (Gudmundson, Brian) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Laird shall register to file documents electronically in this district on or before April 1, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/11/2019. (jb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Gumundson shall register to file documents electronically in this district on or before April 1, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/11/2019. (jb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Alexander shall register to file documents electronically in this district on or before April 1, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/11/2019. (jb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Comite shall register to file documents electronically in this district on or before April 1, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/11/2019. (jb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Alexander shall register to file documents electronically in this district on or before April 1, 2019, and shall file an entry of appearance by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/11/2019. (jb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Laird for Plaintiff Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2876900 by American Airlines Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission PHV)(Donchin, David) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brian Gudmundson for Plaintiff Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2876895 by American Airlines Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission PHV)(Donchin, David) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Carey Alexander for Plaintiff Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2876288 by American Airlines Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission PHV)(Donchin, David) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Erin Green Comite for Plaintiff Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2876281 by American Airlines Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission PHV)(Donchin, David) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph P. Guglielmo for Plaintiff Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2876269 by American Airlines Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission PHV)(Donchin, David) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by American Airlines Federal Credit Union . (Donchin, David) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by David B Donchin on behalf of American Airlines Federal Credit Union (Donchin, David) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2875236. (Donchin, David) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Sonic Capital LLC, Sonic Corp, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries Inc, Sonic Industries LLC, Sonic Restaurants Inc. (kmt) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Sonic Capital LLC, Sonic Corp, Sonic Franchising LLC, Sonic Industries Inc, Sonic Restaurants Inc filed by American Airlines Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonic Restaurants Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Sonic Capital LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sonic Corp is a litigant