This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2022 at 07:37:10 (UTC).

AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beryl A. Howell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03034

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beryl A. Howell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION

Defendants

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Ding

Defendant Attorney

Laurel H. Lum

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS. (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

13 #1

Exhibit A

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate Cases (Joint) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS.(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum on behalf of All Defendants (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

9 #1

Supplement

9 #9

Main Document

8 #1

Supplement

8 #8

Main Document

7 #1

Supplement

7 #7

Main Document

6 #1

Supplement

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 11, 2022. (lcbah4) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

4 #1

Notice and Consent

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. Case related to Case No. 22-3029. (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS. (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ERRATA Correcting Failure to Attach Exhibit A to the Notice of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS re #12 Notice (Other). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate Cases (Joint) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS.(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum on behalf of All Defendants (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS served on 10/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 10/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/13/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 11, 2022. (lcbah4) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zcb, ) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. Case related to Case No. 22-3029. (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9582317) filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less