This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2022 at 07:37:01 (UTC).

AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beryl A. Howell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03029

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beryl A. Howell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION

Defendants

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY

U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR

U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Ding

Defendant Attorney

Laurel H. Lum

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION. (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#19

(#19) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION. (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

18 #1

Supplement

18 #18

Main Document

17 #1

Supplement

17 #17

Main Document

16 #1

Supplement

16 #16

Main Document

15 #1

Supplement

1 #50

Summons

1 #49

Summons

1 #41

Summons

1 #28

Exhibit

1 #27

Exhibit

1 #22

Exhibit

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' motion for summary judgment due by 1/11/2023; plaintiff's opposition due by 2/8/2023; defendants' reply due by 2/22/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' #19 Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases and CONSOLIDATING this case, Civil Case No. 22-3029, with America First Legal Foundation v. U.S. Dept of Treas., Civil Case No. 22-3034, for all purposes. See LCvR 40.5 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 42. The parties are directed that all filings in these consolidated cases should be made only in Case No. 22-3029. The Clerk of Court shall close Case No. 22-3034 and transfer whatever parties are not identical to Case No. 22-3029. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the following SCHEDULING ORDER:(1) By January 11, 2023, defendants shall file their motion for summary judgment;(2) By February 8, 2023, Plaintiff shall file any opposition; and(3) By February 22, 2023, defendants shall file any reply. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 29, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION. (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION. (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/14/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 10/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION served on 10/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 10/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 10/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 10/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 10/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 10/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/13/2022 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION.(Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum on behalf of All Defendants (Lum, Laurel) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 11, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (13) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zcb, ) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zcb, ) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9581909) filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Civil Cover Sheet, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons, #43 Summons, #44 Summons, #45 Summons, #46 Summons, #47 Summons, #48 Summons, #49 Summons, #50 Summons)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less