This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2023 at 10:20:46 (UTC).

America First Legal Foundation v. Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 America First Legal Foundation filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William E. Fitzpatrick and Rossie D. Alston, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01255

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

William E. Fitzpatrick

Presiding Judge

Rossie D. Alston, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

America First Legal Foundation

Defendant

Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Block

Michael Chao Ding

Defendant Attorney

Hugham Chan

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency, filed by America First Legal Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Block, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit D

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons by America First Legal Foundation. (Block, Andrew) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/7/2022) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#3

(#3) First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Ding and Certification of Local Counsel Andrew Block Filing fee $ 75. by America First Legal Foundation. (Block, Andrew) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#4

(#4) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by America First Legal Foundation. (Block, Andrew) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons by America First Legal Foundation. (Block, Andrew) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Michael Chao Ding for America First Legal Foundation. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 11/9/2022. (nneb) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by America First Legal Foundation. America First Legal Foundation served on 11/14/2022, answer due 1/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Block, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

8 #1

Exhibit

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency.(Chan, Hugham) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Hugham Chan on behalf of Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency (Chan, Hugham) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Hugham Chan on behalf of Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency (Chan, Hugham) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency.(Chan, Hugham) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by America First Legal Foundation. America First Legal Foundation served on 11/14/2022, answer due 1/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Block, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Michael Chao Ding for America First Legal Foundation. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 11/9/2022. (nneb) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons by America First Legal Foundation. (Block, Andrew) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #2 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that the proposed summon is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (dvanm) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by America First Legal Foundation. (Block, Andrew) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketElectronic Fee Payment - by America First Legal Foundation. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8648267.. (Block, Andrew) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Ding and Certification of Local Counsel Andrew Block Filing fee $ 75. by America First Legal Foundation. (Block, Andrew) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (dvanm) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by America First Legal Foundation. (Block, Andrew) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/7/2022) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency, filed by America First Legal Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Block, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less