Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2020 at 07:52:54 (UTC).

AMER v. POMPEO et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 AMER filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against POMPEO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD A. MCHUGH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04152

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD A. MCHUGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIFI MOHAMED AMER

Defendants

JONATHAN COHEN

CARL RISCH

MICHAEL R. POMPEO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER M. CASAZZA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DAVID E. PIVER

150 Strafford Ave Ste 115

Wayne, PA 19087

Defendant Attorney

LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER on behalf of JONATHAN COHEN, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, CARL RISCH with Certificate of Service(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (va, ) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FIFI MOHAMED AMER (CASAZZA, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to JONATHAN COHEN, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, CARL RISCH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. E-mailed To: CHRISTOPHER M. CASAZZA, ESQ. on 8/25/2020 (dmc, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Writ of Mandamus against JONATHAN COHEN, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, CARL RISCH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14516584.), filed by FIFI MOHAMED AMER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Form, #4 Exhibit Exhibit Index, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A, #6 Errata Exhibit B)(CASAZZA, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER