This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:12:16 (UTC).

Amer Sports Canada Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Amer Sports Canada Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07943

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amer Sports Canada Inc.

Defendant

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Isaku Begert

Attorney at Greer, Burns And Crain, Ltd.

300 S Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #39 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/29/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#40

(#40) MEMORANDUM by Amer Sports Canada Inc. in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #39 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#44

(#44) MAILED trademark closing report and a certified copy of the order dated 1/29/2020 to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (pj, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#43

(#43) FINAL JUDGMENT Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/29/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#42

(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #39 is granted. Enter Final Judgment Order. Status hearing set for 3/11/2020 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

40 #2

Exhibit 1

#1

(#7) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 1/10/2020 (ph, ). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#39

(#39) MOTION by Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. for entry of default as to all Defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. for default judgment as to all Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#38

(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Amer Sports Canada Inc. as to Certain Defendant Domain Names (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

40 #1

Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio

1 #1

Exhibit 1

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MAILED trademark closing report and a certified copy of the order dated 1/29/2020 to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (pj, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) FINAL JUDGMENT Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/29/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #39 is granted. Enter Final Judgment Order. Status hearing set for 3/11/2020 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #39 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/29/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MEMORANDUM by Amer Sports Canada Inc. in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #39 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION by Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. for entry of default as to all Defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. for default judgment as to all Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Amer Sports Canada Inc. as to Certain Defendant Domain Names (Martin, Allyson) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/7/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #33 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Status hearing set for 3/11/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff's oral motion to unseal all previously sealed documents is granted. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #33 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/7/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED Complaint by Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 1/10/2020 (ph, ). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 1/10/2020 (ph, ). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amer Sports Canada Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Amer Sports Canada Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16498263. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less