This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2021 at 09:32:46 (UTC).

Amentum Special Mission Services, Inc. v. International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 199

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Amentum Special Mission Services, Inc filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 199. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Liam O'Grady and Theresa Carroll Buchanan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00839

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amentum Special Mission Services, Inc.

Defendant

International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 199

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Byron Flood

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC (DC)

1909 K Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDERED that the Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/2/2021. (see Order for further details) (swil) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Amentum Special Mission Services, Inc. (Flood, John) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amentum Special Mission Services, Inc.. (Flood, John) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#2

(#2) Civil Miscellaneous Case Civil Cover Sheet ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AVAEDC-7895339.), filed by Amentum Special Mission Services, Inc..(Flood, John) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7895307.), filed by Amentum Special Mission Services, Inc..(Flood, John) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDERED that the Plaintiffs Complaint (Dkt. 1) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/2/2021. (see Order for further details) (swil) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Amentum Special Mission Services, Inc. (Flood, John) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction: The filing user has been notified that the civil cover sheet was filed and an additional payment was received in re #2 Civil Miscellaneous Case. (jlan) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (jlan) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amentum Special Mission Services, Inc.. (Flood, John) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Miscellaneous Case Civil Cover Sheet ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number AVAEDC-7895339.), filed by Amentum Special Mission Services, Inc..(Flood, John) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7895307.), filed by Amentum Special Mission Services, Inc..(Flood, John) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 150, AFL-CIO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Byron Flood