This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2020 at 12:35:45 (UTC).

AMCO Insurance Company v. ProAmerican Home Improvements, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 AMCO Insurance Company filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against ProAmerican Home Improvements, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl R. Zwart and John M. Gerrard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03079

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

Presiding Judge

John M. Gerrard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMCO Insurance Company

Defendants

CONSTANCE SHAHEEN

PROAMERICAN HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC.

Constance Reyes Shaheen

Constance Rayes Shaheen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hal J. Kleinman

Attorney at STUTMAN LAW FIRM

324 Winding Way West

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

George J. Matz

Attorney at STUTMAN LAW FIRM

500 Office Center Drive, Suite 301

Fort Washington, PA 19034

Kenneth B. Grear

Attorney at STUTMAN LAW FIRM

500 Office Center Drive, Suite 301

Fort Washington, PA 19034

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER that the motion to withdraw filed by Kenneth B. Grear, as counsel of record for Plaintiff, (Filing No. #6 ), is granted. Kenneth B. Grear shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant ProAmerican Home Improvements, Inc.. Waiver sent on 8/14/2020; Constance Reyes Shaheen. Waiver sent on 8/14/2020. (Kleinman, Hal) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

11 #4

Exhibit Certificate of Service

11 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4200816 by Attorney George J. Matz on behalf of Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Matz, George) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to defendants ProAmerican Home Improvements, Inc. and Constance Reyes Shaheen. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#8

(#8) Summons Requested as to CONSTANCE REYES SHAHEEN a/k/a CONSTANCE RAYES SHAHEEN regarding Complaint, #1 . (Kleinman, Hal) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Requested as to PROAMERICAN HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Kleinman, Hal) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Hal J. Kleinman on behalf of Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company.(Kleinman, Hal) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney George J. Matz has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Kenneth B. Grear has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit Shaheen Summons

1 #2

Exhibit Proamerican Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against PROAMERICAN HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC., CONSTANCE SHAHEEN ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4196523), by Attorney Hal J. Kleinman on behalf of AMCO Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proamerican Summons, #3 Exhibit Shaheen Summons)(Kleinman, Hal) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant ProAmerican Home Improvements, Inc.. Waiver sent on 8/14/2020; Constance Reyes Shaheen. Waiver sent on 8/14/2020. (Kleinman, Hal) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for AMCO Insurance Company. by Attorney Hal J. Kleinman on behalf of Plaintiffs AMCO Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Kleinman, Hal) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #11 for attorney George J. Matz. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4200816 by Attorney George J. Matz on behalf of Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Matz, George) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER that the motion to withdraw filed by Kenneth B. Grear, as counsel of record for Plaintiff, (Filing No. #6 ), is granted. Kenneth B. Grear shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to defendants ProAmerican Home Improvements, Inc. and Constance Reyes Shaheen. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Requested as to CONSTANCE REYES SHAHEEN a/k/a CONSTANCE RAYES SHAHEEN regarding Complaint, #1 . (Kleinman, Hal) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Requested as to PROAMERICAN HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Kleinman, Hal) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Hal J. Kleinman on behalf of Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company.(Kleinman, Hal) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#5) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney George J. Matz has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Kenneth B. Grear has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against PROAMERICAN HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC., CONSTANCE SHAHEEN ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4196523), by Attorney Hal J. Kleinman on behalf of AMCO Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proamerican Summons, #3 Exhibit Shaheen Summons)(Kleinman, Hal) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less