This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/22/2020 at 08:17:13 (UTC).

Ambus et al v. Myeres et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2020 Ambus filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Myeres. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney W. Sippel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00573

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney W. Sippel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Karen Ambus

St. Louis, MO 63120

Irene Smith

St. Louis, MO 63120

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Larry Myeres

The Cincinnati Insurance Company

301 West High St. Rm. 530

Jefferson City, MO 65101

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Catherine L Schwarze

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES PC - St Louis

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Brandon B. Copeland

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES PC - St Louis

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

David P. Bub

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES PC - St Louis

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for remand #13 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for St. Louis City, Missouri. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties each bear their own costs incurred by reason of these removal and remand proceedings. [A COPY SENT TO ST. LOUIS CITY CIRCUIT COURT THIS DATE] Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/9/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to the Circuit Court of St. Louis City filed by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Bub, David) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

13 #1

Exhibit Memorandum in Support

#13

(#13) PLAINTIFFS' KAREN AMBUS AND IRENE J SMITH JOINT MOTION TO REMAND THIS CAUSE TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF SAINT LOUIS CITY by Plaintiff Karen Ambus and Irene J. Smith. (KEK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2020: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support) (KEK). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 6/30/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/7/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 16S - St. Louis before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/21/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss #8 is GRANTED. The Cincinnati Insurance Company terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/19/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Bub, David) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Cincinnati Insurance Company filed by Defendants Larry Myeres, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Bub, David) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Party Cincinnati Insurance Company by Defendants Larry Myeres, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bub, David) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#7

(#7) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM for Contribution against plaintiff Irene Smith by The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Larry Myeres.(Bub, David) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Catherine L Schwarze for Defendants The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Larry Myeres. (Schwarze, Catherine) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon B. Copeland for Defendants The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Larry Myeres. (Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri, filed by Karen Ambus, Irene Smith.(JWD) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Bub, David) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Parent companies: Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Bub, David) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City, case number 2022-CC00447, with receipt number AMOEDC-7881710, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bub, David) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 15. Wed Jun 10 09:24:18 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for remand #13 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for St. Louis City, Missouri. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties each bear their own costs incurred by reason of these removal and remand proceedings. [A COPY SENT TO ST. LOUIS CITY CIRCUIT COURT THIS DATE] Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/9/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to the Circuit Court of St. Louis City filed by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Bub, David) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PLAINTIFFS' KAREN AMBUS AND IRENE J SMITH JOINT MOTION TO REMAND THIS CAUSE TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF SAINT LOUIS CITY by Plaintiff Karen Ambus and Irene J. Smith. (KEK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2020: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support) (KEK). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 12. Thu May 21 11:49:35 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 6/30/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/7/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 16S - St. Louis before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/21/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Tue May 19 16:48:50 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss #8 is GRANTED. The Cincinnati Insurance Company terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/19/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Bub, David) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Cincinnati Insurance Company filed by Defendants Larry Myeres, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Bub, David) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Party Cincinnati Insurance Company by Defendants Larry Myeres, The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bub, David) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM for Contribution against plaintiff Irene Smith by The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Larry Myeres.(Bub, David) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Catherine L Schwarze for Defendants The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Larry Myeres. (Schwarze, Catherine) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon B. Copeland for Defendants The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Larry Myeres. (Copeland, Brandon) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (JWD) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri, filed by Karen Ambus, Irene Smith.(JWD) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Bub, David) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Parent companies: Cincinnati Financial Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Bub, David) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City, case number 2022-CC00447, with receipt number AMOEDC-7881710, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bub, David) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David P. Bub