This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2020 at 07:56:40 (UTC).

AMBASSADOR BEACH OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC v. GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 AMBASSADOR BEACH OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J FRANK and MARK E WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00237

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

Presiding Judge

MARK E WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMBASSADOR BEACH OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

AMBASSADOR BEACH OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC

Defendant

GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BENJAMIN ARTHUR RICHTER

Attorney at GED LAWYERS LLP - BOCA RATON FL

7171 N Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

SCOTT MICHAEL ROSSO

Attorney at GED LAWYERS - BOCA RATON FL

7171 North Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendant Attorney

ERICA KAROL WILLIAMS

Attorney at GUIDEONE INSURANCE - DES MOINES IA

Po Box 14503

Des Moines, IA 50306

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN ARTHUR RICHTER on behalf of AMBASSADOR BEACH OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC (RICHTER, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The jury trial is set for the trial period that begins on Monday, 9/20/2021. The discovery deadline is 3/26/2021. The deadline for filing summary-judgment motions is 21 days after the discovery deadline, 4/16/2021. (Mediation Report due by 5/7/2021., Case referred to mediation.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/23/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (WILLIAMS, ERICA) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#8

(#8) STATUS REPORT regarding discovery by GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (WILLIAMS, ERICA) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (WILLIAMS, ERICA) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (WILLIAMS, ERICA) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#5

(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WILLIAMS, ERICA) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#4

(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/22/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/22/2020. Discovery due by 1/6/2021. Status Report due by 10/8/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/8/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE re DAVID R. SHAHEEN as to AMBASSADOR BEACH OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC. (jcw) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit D - Notice of Removal - State Court

1 #3

Exhibit C - Certification

1 #2

Exhibit B - Estimate

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY from Bay County, 14th Judicial Circuit, case number 20001161CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5635472.), filed by GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Estimate, #3 Exhibit C - Certification, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Removal - State Court) (WILLIAMS, ERICA) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN ARTHUR RICHTER on behalf of AMBASSADOR BEACH OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC (RICHTER, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The jury trial is set for the trial period that begins on Monday, 9/20/2021. The discovery deadline is 3/26/2021. The deadline for filing summary-judgment motions is 21 days after the discovery deadline, 4/16/2021. (Mediation Report due by 5/7/2021., Case referred to mediation.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/23/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (WILLIAMS, ERICA) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #4 Initial Scheduling Order - Rule 26 Meeting Report has not been filed. (jcw) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings Status Report due by 11/9/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATUS REPORT regarding discovery by GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (WILLIAMS, ERICA) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #4 Initial Scheduling Order - Corporate Disclosure Statement has not been filed by AMBASSADOR BEACH OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC. (jcw) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (WILLIAMS, ERICA) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (WILLIAMS, ERICA) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WILLIAMS, ERICA) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/22/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/22/2020. Discovery due by 1/6/2021. Status Report due by 10/8/2020. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/8/2020. (jcw) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE re DAVID R. SHAHEEN as to AMBASSADOR BEACH OWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC. (jcw) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. In accordance with N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a completed Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44) is to be filed with each civil case. Therefore, please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet:, which is found under "Other Documents". (jcw) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY from Bay County, 14th Judicial Circuit, case number 20001161CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5635472.), filed by GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Estimate, #3 Exhibit C - Certification, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Removal - State Court) (WILLIAMS, ERICA) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GUIDEONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant