This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/28/2022 at 06:41:43 (UTC).

Amazon.com Inc et al v. Redicol et al

Case Summary

On July 22, 2022, Amazon.com, Inc, Amazon.com services LLC, and 3M Company (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Lauren B. Rainwater and Scott R. Commerson of Davis Wright Tremaine, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against individuals and entities doing business as certain amazon selling accounts; and DOES 1-10 (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief and damages for alleged trademark infringement. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington, with Judge Robert S. Lasnik presiding.

In the complaint, the plaintiffs stated, “Amazon owns and operates the Amazon Store and equivalent counterpart international stores and websites. Amazon’s stores offer products and services to customers in more than 100 countries around the globe. Some of the products are sold directly by Amazon, while others are sold by Amazon’s numerous third-party selling partners.”

Plaintiffs also stated, “3M has sold millions of stethoscopes in the United States over the past 50 years, including in the Amazon Store. [...] 3M owns, manages, enforces, licenses, and maintains IP, including various trademarks. Relevant to this Complaint, 3M owns the following registered trademarks (‘3M Trademarks’).”

The plaintiffs then alleged, “Defendants advertised, marketed, offered, and sold counterfeit 3M products in the Amazon Store, using the 3M Trademarks, without authorization, to deceive customers about the authenticity and origin of the products and the products’ affiliation with 3M.”

Plaintiffs also alleged, “As a result of their illegal actions, Defendants have infringed and misused 3M’s IP, willfully deceived and harmed Amazon, 3M, and their customers, compromised the integrity of the Amazon Store, and undermined the trust that customers place in Amazon and 3M’s products”

The plaintiffs then alleged, “3M has reviewed physical samples and/or images of the 3M-branded products sold by Defendants’ Amazon Selling Accounts and confirmed that the products are inauthentic and bear counterfeits of one or more of the 3M Trademarks, and that 3M has never authorized the sale of such products.”

Plaintiffs further alleged that “Defendants operated in concert with one another in their marketing, selling, and distribution of inauthentic 3M-branded products. Defendants are associated through common physical addresses, shipping addresses, phone numbers, email addresses, and/or IP addresses provided to Amazon or used to access their Amazon Selling Accounts.”

Plaintiffs additionally alleged that “Defendants knew they were prohibited from violating third-party IP rights or any applicable laws while selling products in the Amazon Store. Defendants have deceived Amazon’s customers and Amazon, infringed and misused the IP rights of 3M, harmed the integrity of and customer trust in the Amazon Store, and tarnished Amazon’s and 3M’s brands. [...] Defendants unlawfully advertised, marketed, offered, and sold products bearing counterfeit versions of the 3M Trademarks with the intent and likelihood of causing customer confusion, mistake, and deception as to the products’ source, origin, and authenticity.”

Plaintiffs presented four claims for relief, including claims for the alleged trademark infringement, false designation of origin, false advertising, and a violation of the Washington Consumer Protection Act. 

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiffs requested permanent injunctive and declaratory relief and an award for general, special, and actual damages, costs,  attorney’s fees, and pre-judgment interest. 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01020

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert S. Lasnik

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Amazon.com Inc

Amazon.com Services LLC

3M Company

Defendants

Aivaeso Redicol an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

Alvinste Store an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

Annette A Smith LLC an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

Anthons Store an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

Barry Company an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

Billy Business an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

Brownartic Store an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

Ceeoty Atoxe an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

Chester Supply an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

Chris Skamp an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

Clara Wholesale an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

David Factory an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

Dean Tech an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

Easrscope Store an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

Eceit Resod an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

EEG Ventures LLC an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

Elivera Counly an individual or entity doing business as an Amazon Selling Account

43 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren Burdette Rainwater

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE (SEA)

920 Fifth Ave, Ste 3300

Seattle, WA 98104-1610

Scott R Commerson

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE (LA)

865 S Figueroa St Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (MJV) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Aivaeso Redicol, Alvinste Store, Annette A Smith LLC, Anthons Store, Barry Company, Billy Business, Brownartic Store, Ceeoty Atoxe, Chester Supply, Chris Skamp, Clara Wholesale, David Factory, Dean Tech, EEG Ventures LLC, Easrscope Store, Eceit Resod, Elivera Counly, Greg Trade, Gretna Mart LLC, Heaitman Store, Hittmedical LLC, Hsiguans LLC, Hubert Moss, Jeffrey Crof, John Centers, KTPOA US, Kebetty Store, Keith Supplies, Kingery Store, Lopains Veen, Luvoice, Lvetown, Maitler Store, Mardiou US, Meceiall Store, Moacrdx Store, Mooky Store, Onzo Shop, Osagele US, Paksa Store, Pingping LLC, Qcrowe US, Rahul Ebert LLC, Rimas Store, Roger Store, Scott Center, Sherry Online, Slacks Shop, Soeucelo Store, Souteo Store, Srencpeos Store, Sunica Store, Tammly Store, Tanyaer Store, Tedabe Store, Vincent Health, Vinecre Onse, Welpance LLC, Willie Holland (MJV) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by 3M Company (Commerson, Scott) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Amazon.com Services LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. (Commerson, Scott) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

1 #61

Summons Vincent Health

1 #59

Summons Tanyaer Store

1 #55

Summons Souteo Store

1 #51

Summons Scott Center

1 #41

Summons Moacrdx Store

1 #39

Summons Mardiou US

1 #27

Summons Hsiguans LLC

1 #25

Summons Heaitman Store

1 #24

Summons Gretna Mart LLC

1 #17

Summons David Factory

1 #15

Summons Chris Skamp

1 #13

Summons Ceeoty Atoxe

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

57 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (MJV) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Aivaeso Redicol, Alvinste Store, Annette A Smith LLC, Anthons Store, Barry Company, Billy Business, Brownartic Store, Ceeoty Atoxe, Chester Supply, Chris Skamp, Clara Wholesale, David Factory, Dean Tech, EEG Ventures LLC, Easrscope Store, Eceit Resod, Elivera Counly, Greg Trade, Gretna Mart LLC, Heaitman Store, Hittmedical LLC, Hsiguans LLC, Hubert Moss, Jeffrey Crof, John Centers, KTPOA US, Kebetty Store, Keith Supplies, Kingery Store, Lopains Veen, Luvoice, Lvetown, Maitler Store, Mardiou US, Meceiall Store, Moacrdx Store, Mooky Store, Onzo Shop, Osagele US, Paksa Store, Pingping LLC, Qcrowe US, Rahul Ebert LLC, Rimas Store, Roger Store, Scott Center, Sherry Online, Slacks Shop, Soeucelo Store, Souteo Store, Srencpeos Store, Sunica Store, Tammly Store, Tanyaer Store, Tedabe Store, Vincent Health, Vinecre Onse, Welpance LLC, Willie Holland (MJV) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketJudge Robert S. Lasnik added. (MJV) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by 3M Company (Commerson, Scott) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Amazon.com Services LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. (Commerson, Scott) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Aivaeso Redicol, Alvinste Store, Annette A. Smith LLC, Anthons Store, Barry Company, Billy Business, Brownartic Store, Ceeoty Atoxe, Chester Supply, Chris Skamp, Clara Wholesale, David Factory, Dean Tech, EEG Ventures LLC, Easrscope Store, Eceit Resod, Elivera Counly, Greg Trade, Gretna Mart LLC, Heaitman Store, Hittmedical LLC, Hsiguans LLC, Hubert Moss, Jeffrey Crof, John Centers, KTPOA US, Kebetty Store, Keith Supplies, Kingery Store, Lopains Veen, Luvoice, Lvetown, Maitler Store, Mardiou US, Meceiall Store, Moacrdx Store, Mooky Store, Onzo Shop, Osagele US, Paksa Store, Pingping LLC, Qcrowe US, Rahul Ebert LLC, Rimas Store, Roger Store, Scott Center, Sherry Online, Slacks Shop, Soeucelo Store, Souteo Store, Srencpeos Store, Sunica Store, Tammly Store, Tanyaer Store, Tedabe Store, Vincent Health, Vinecre Onse, Welpance LLC, Willie Holland (Receipt # AWAWDC-7637610), filed by 3M Company, Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #6 Summons Aivaeso Redicol, #7 Summons Alvinste Store, #8 Summons Annette A. Smith LLC, #9 Summons Anthons Store, #10 Summons Barry Company, #11 Summons Billy Business, #12 Summons Brownartic Store, #13 Summons Ceeoty Atoxe, #14 Summons Chester Supply, #15 Summons Chris Skamp, #16 Summons Clara Wholesale, #17 Summons David Factory, #18 Summons Dean Tech, #19 Summons Easrscope Store, #20 Summons Eceit Resod, #21 Summons EEG Ventures LLC, #22 Summons Elivera Counly, #23 Summons Greg Trade, #24 Summons Gretna Mart LLC, #25 Summons Heaitman Store, #26 Summons Hittmedical LLC, #27 Summons Hsiguans LLC, #28 Summons Hubert Moss, #29 Summons Jeffrey Crof, #30 Summons John Centers, #31 Summons Kebetty Store, #32 Summons Keith Supplies, #33 Summons Kingery Store, #34 Summons KTPOA US, #35 Summons Lopains Veen, #36 Summons Luvoice, #37 Summons Lvetown, #38 Summons Maitler Store, #39 Summons Mardiou US, #40 Summons Meceiall Store, #41 Summons Moacrdx Store, #42 Summons Mooky Store, #43 Summons Onzo Shop, #44 Summons Osagele US, #45 Summons Paksa Store, #46 Summons Pingping LLC, #47 Summons Qcrowe US, #48 Summons Rahul Ebert LLC, #49 Summons Rimas Store, #50 Summons Roger Store, #51 Summons Scott Center, #52 Summons Sherry Online, #53 Summons Slacks Shop, #54 Summons Soeucelo Store, #55 Summons Souteo Store, #56 Summons Srencpeos Store, #57 Summons Sunica Store, #58 Summons Tammly Store, #59 Summons Tanyaer Store, #60 Summons Tedabe Store, #61 Summons Vincent Health, #62 Summons Vinecre Onse, #63 Summons Welpance LLC, #64 Summons Willie Holland)(Commerson, Scott) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARRY, OFFICER is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where 3M COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott R Commerson