This case was last updated from PACER on 12/17/2019 at 08:14:48 (UTC).

Amazon.com et al v. Amazon Services et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 Amazon com filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Amazon Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jill N. Parrish and Evelyn J. Furse. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00785

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jill N. Parrish

Referral Judge

Evelyn J. Furse

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Amazon Services

Amazon.com

Amazon Technologies

Defendants

Creating Wealth International

Creating Wealth Institute

Creating Wealth Academy

Prime Global Source

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kristine E. Johnson

Attorney at PARSONS BEHLE & LATIMER

201 S Main St Ste 1800, Po Box 45898

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-0898

Juliette P. White

Attorney at PARSONS BEHLE & LATIMER

201 S Main St Ste 1800, Po Box 45898

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-0898

Christopher T. Wion

Attorney at SUMMIT LAW GROUP

315 5Th Ave Ste 1000

Seattle, WA 98104

Philip S. McCune

Attorney at SUMMIT LAW GROUP

315 5Th Ave Ste 1000

Seattle, WA 98104-2682

Jesse Lee Taylor

Attorney at SUMMIT LAW GROUP

315 5Th Ave Ste 1000

Seattle, WA 98104

Defendant Attorney

James W. McConkie, III

Attorney at WORKMAN NYDEGGER

60 E South Temple Ste 1000

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) ORDER granting #26 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to submit the Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall have up to and including January 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/27/2019. (jds) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

26 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#26

(#26) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Services, Amazon Technologies, Amazon.com. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Johnson, Kristine) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#25

(#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Creating Wealth Academy answer due 1/13/2020; Creating Wealth Institute answer due 1/13/2020; Creating Wealth International answer due 1/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/22/2019. (jds) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

24 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#24

(#24) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Creating Wealth Academy, Creating Wealth Institute, Creating Wealth International, Prime Global Source. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(McConkie, James) Modified event type on 11/22/2019 (jds). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#23

(#23) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #10 filed by Defendants Creating Wealth Academy, Creating Wealth Institute, Creating Wealth International, Prime Global Source (McConkie, James) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

4 #3

Exhibit C-ECF Registration Form

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order B-Admitting Jesse Taylor

4 #1

Exhibit A-Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#4

(#7) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jesse Lee Taylor for Amazon Services,Jesse Lee Taylor for Amazon Technologies,Jesse Lee Taylor for Amazon.com. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/21/2019. (jds) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

3 #3

Exhibit C-ECF Registration Form

3 #2

Text of Proposed Order B-Order Admitting Philip McCune

3 #1

Exhibit A-Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#3

(#8) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip S. McCune for Amazon Services,Philip S. McCune for Amazon Technologies,Philip S. McCune for Amazon.com. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/21/2019. (jds) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Creating Wealth Academy answer due 1/13/2020; Creating Wealth Institute answer due 1/13/2020; Creating Wealth International answer due 1/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/22/2019. (jds) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs Amazon Services, Amazon Technologies and Amazon.com are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER granting #26 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to submit the Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall have up to and including January 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/27/2019. (jds) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Services, Amazon Technologies, Amazon.com. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Johnson, Kristine) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Creating Wealth Academy answer due 1/13/2020; Creating Wealth Institute answer due 1/13/2020; Creating Wealth International answer due 1/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/22/2019. (jds) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Creating Wealth Academy, Creating Wealth Institute, Creating Wealth International, Prime Global Source. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(McConkie, James) Modified event type on 11/22/2019 (jds). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #10 filed by Defendants Creating Wealth Academy, Creating Wealth Institute, Creating Wealth International, Prime Global Source (McConkie, James) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) DOCKET TEXT ORDER DENYING without prejudice #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for failure to establish good cause for the extension. If the parties seek to extend the time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, they must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1) ("When an act may or must be done within a specified time, the court may, for good cause, extend the time with or without motion or notice if the court acts, or if a request is made, before the original time or its extension expires; or on motion made after the time has expired if the party failed to act because of excusable neglect."). Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/20/2019. No attached document. (ang) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Creating Wealth Academy, Creating Wealth Institute, Creating Wealth International, Prime Global Source. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse. Attorney James W. McConkie, III added to party Creating Wealth Academy(pty:dft), Attorney James W. McConkie, III added to party Creating Wealth Institute(pty:dft), Attorney James W. McConkie, III added to party Creating Wealth International(pty:dft), Attorney James W. McConkie, III added to party Prime Global Source(pty:dft)(McConkie, James) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Amazon.com, Amazon Technologies, Amazon Services as to Prime Global Source Waiver sent on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Johnson, Kristine) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amazon.com, Amazon Technologies, Amazon Services as to Creating Wealth Academy served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Johnson, Kristine) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amazon.com, Amazon Technologies, Amazon Services as to Creating Wealth Institute served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Johnson, Kristine) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/21/19. (ss) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher T. Wion for Amazon Services,Christopher T. Wion for Amazon Technologies,Christopher T. Wion for Amazon.com. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/21/2019. (jds) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip S. McCune for Amazon Services,Philip S. McCune for Amazon Technologies,Philip S. McCune for Amazon.com. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/21/2019. (jds) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jesse Lee Taylor for Amazon Services,Jesse Lee Taylor for Amazon Technologies,Jesse Lee Taylor for Amazon.com. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 10/21/2019. (jds) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (tlh) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher T. Wion , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3398331, filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Services, Amazon Technologies, Amazon.com. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Admitting Christopher Wion, #3 Exhibit C-ECF Registration Form)(Johnson, Kristine) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jesse Taylor , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3398322, filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Services, Amazon Technologies, Amazon.com. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order B-Admitting Jesse Taylor, #3 Exhibit C-ECF Registration Form)(Johnson, Kristine) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip S. McCune , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3398313, filed by Plaintiffs Amazon Services, Amazon Technologies, Amazon.com. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order B-Order Admitting Philip McCune, #3 Exhibit C-ECF Registration Form)(Johnson, Kristine) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3398311) filed by Amazon.com, Amazon Technologies, Amazon Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Johnson, Kristine) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiffs Amazon Services, Amazon Technologies and Amazon.com are directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less