Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/11/2019 at 07:51:29 (UTC).

Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc. v. American Inter-Fidelity Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 Amazing Trucking Logistics, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against American Inter-Fidelity Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James T Moody and Joshua P Kolar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00284

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James T Moody

Referral Judge

Joshua P Kolar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

American Inter-Fidelity Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

David L LaPorte

Attorney at LaPorte & Associates PC

Po Box 400

Flossmoor, IL 60422

James Russell Williams

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP - Chi/IL

55 W Monroe St Ste 3800

Chicago, IL 60603-5001

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Gerald M Bishop

Attorney at Gerald M Bishop & Associates

2115 W Lincoln Highway

Merrillville, IN 46410

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bishop, Gerald) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Counter Defendant Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc., Plaintiff Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc.. (Williams, James) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION to reset Rule 16 Conference by Counter Defendant Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc., Plaintiff Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc.. (LaPorte, David) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#10

(#10) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/20/2019. (tc) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2019 11:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/30/2019. (tc) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #6 Counterclaim by Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc..(LaPorte, David) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc.. (LaPorte, David) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David L LaPorte on behalf of Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc. (LaPorte, David) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C- Counterclaim

1 #2

Exhibit B- Answer

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3974214.) from Superior Court of Lake County, IN, Cause No. 45C01-1903-M1-000184, filed by Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Answer, #3 Exhibit C- Counterclaim, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(LaPorte, David) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/27/2019, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pla appeared by atty David LaPorte. Dft appeared by atty Gerald Bishop. As the party who sought federal jurisdiction, Defendant is ORDERED to file by 10/11/2019 a brief regarding whether the amount at issue in the counterclaim applies toward the amount in controversy requirement for diversity subject matter jurisdiction. The Report filed as DE #15 is APPROVED and ADOPTED as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 10/21/2019. All discovery to be completed by 6/1/2020. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 4/1/2020. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 5/1/2020. Rule 26(e) supplements due by 7/1/2020. The last date to seek leave of court to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings for the Pltf is 1/2/2020; for the Dft is 1/16/2020. Parties anticipate the case should be ready for a 2 day bench trial by 9/1/2020. Mediator Selection Deadline is 12/1/2019. Magistrate Consent forms ddl extended to 10/18/2019. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. The summary judgment deadline in FRCP 56 shall not apply. (Tape #FTR GOLD.) (tc) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bishop, Gerald) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER: Court GRANTS #13 Motion for Withdrawal as Counsel. The appearance of Attorney James Russell Williams on behalf of Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc. is WITHDRAWN. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 9/5/2019. Text entry order. (tc) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Counter Defendant Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc., Plaintiff Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc.. (Williams, James) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: Court GRANTS #11 Joint Motion to Reset Rule 16 Pre-Trial Conference. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2019 is RESET to 9/27/2019 10:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 9/4/2019. Text entry order. (tc) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint MOTION to reset Rule 16 Conference by Counter Defendant Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc., Plaintiff Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc.. (LaPorte, David) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/20/2019. (tc) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2019 11:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/30/2019. (tc) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #6 Counterclaim by Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc..(LaPorte, David) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation aboutthese matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/20/2019. (tc) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • **NEW CASE** Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (nae) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc.. (LaPorte, David) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David L LaPorte on behalf of Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc. (LaPorte, David) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3974214.) from Superior Court of Lake County, IN, Cause No. 45C01-1903-M1-000184, filed by Amazing Trucking & Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Answer, #3 Exhibit C- Counterclaim, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(LaPorte, David) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Inter-Fidelity Exchange Corp is a litigant