This case was last updated from PACER on 12/28/2019 at 07:25:22 (UTC).

AMATO v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 AMATO filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael A. Shipp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-19449

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARLO AMATO

Respondent

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JARRED S. FREEMAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JARRED S. FREEMAN LLC

135 Green St, Suite 302

Woodbridge, NJ 07095

Respondent Attorneys

NICHOLAS PAUL GRIPPO

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY

970 Broad Street

Newark, NJ 07102

ELISA TALORA WIYGUL

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY

402 East State Street, Room 430

Trenton, NJ 08608

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 18-561(MAS) by CARLO AMATO. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Brief)(FREEMAN, JARRED) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege

#4

(#4) Letter from United States re Correcting Docket No. 3, Letter Motion re Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege re #3 MOTION For Order That Petitioner Has Waived Attorney-Client Privilege re #1 First MOTION to Vacate set aside, or correct sentence . (Attachments: #1 Brief Letter Motion re Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege, #2 Text of Proposed Order re Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege)(WIYGUL, ELISA) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

4 #1

Brief Letter Motion re Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege

#5

(#5) RESPONSE in Opposition filed by CARLO AMATO re #3 MOTION For Order That Petitioner Has Waived Attorney-Client Privilege re #1 First MOTION to Vacate set aside, or correct sentence (FREEMAN, JARRED) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #2

Brief

#2

(#2) ORDER that Respondent shall file an answer to the #1 Motion within sixty (60) days of the entry of this Order; Petitioner may file and serve a reply in support of the Motion within thirty (30) days after the answer is filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/04/2019. (jem) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

1 #1

Certification

#3

(#3) MOTION For Order That Petitioner Has Waived Attorney-Client Privilege re #1 First MOTION to Vacate set aside, or correct sentence by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege)(WIYGUL, ELISA) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order re Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RESPONSE in Opposition filed by CARLO AMATO re #3 MOTION For Order That Petitioner Has Waived Attorney-Client Privilege re #1 First MOTION to Vacate set aside, or correct sentence (FREEMAN, JARRED) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from United States re Correcting Docket No. 3, Letter Motion re Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege re #3 MOTION For Order That Petitioner Has Waived Attorney-Client Privilege re #1 First MOTION to Vacate set aside, or correct sentence . (Attachments: #1 Brief Letter Motion re Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege, #2 Text of Proposed Order re Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege)(WIYGUL, ELISA) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - For future reference, when using the event motion, you must file a Notice of Motion along with the other documents required by the rules of this Court. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jem) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION For Order That Petitioner Has Waived Attorney-Client Privilege re #1 First MOTION to Vacate set aside, or correct sentence . Motion set for 1/6/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION For Order That Petitioner Has Waived Attorney-Client Privilege re #1 First MOTION to Vacate set aside, or correct sentence by THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege)(WIYGUL, ELISA) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER that Respondent shall file an answer to the #1 Motion within sixty (60) days of the entry of this Order; Petitioner may file and serve a reply in support of the Motion within thirty (30) days after the answer is filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/04/2019. (jem) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard the motion hearing date set by the clerks office. The MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence is not technically a motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (abr) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #1 First MOTION to Vacate set aside, or correct sentence. Motion set for 12/2/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Judge Michael A. Shipp added. (abr) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Carlo Amato was added to the docket as a defendant instead of Petitioner. The United States of America should have been added to the docket as a Respondent. The event selected Motion to Vacate is incorrect. This is an initial filing therefore the correct event is Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), which is found under Civil - Complaints and Other Initiating Documents, as opposed to the motion to vacate which is found under Motions. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 18-561(MAS) by CARLO AMATO. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Brief)(FREEMAN, JARRED) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.