This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2019 at 07:29:47 (UTC).

Amarvi-Brown v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 Amarvi-Brown filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Katherine M. Menendez and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-02583

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ann Amarvi-Brown

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

3Rd Party Defendant

Reliakor Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cory P Whalen

Attorney at SiebenCarey, P.A.

901 Marquette Avenue, Suite 500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas Andrew Rauch

Attorney at Lind Jensen Sullivan Peterson, PA

1300 At&T Tower, 901 Marquette Avenue South

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Brian A Wood

Attorney at Lind Jensen Sullivan & Peterson, PA

901 Marquette Ave. S., Ste. 1300

Mpls, MN 55402

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Alan P King

Attorney at Goetz & Eckland, PA

43 Main St Se Ste 505

Mpls, MN 55414

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Reliakor Services, Inc.. filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-S&C, #2 Exhibit(s) B-Contract) (Wood, Brian) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#12

(#12) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2020. Fact Discovery due by 6/15/2020. Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 6/15/2020. Motions (disp) due by 6/30/2020. Ready for trial due by 10/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/6/2019. (KAT) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

6 #2

Exhibit(s) B-Contract

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7166093) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit(s) A-Sumons and Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wood, Brian) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) Third Party Summons Issued as to Reliakor Services, Inc. (lmb) Modified text on 9/30/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 09/30/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit(s) A-S&C

5 #1

Consent Form

1 #1

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Wood, Brian) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit(s) A-Sumons and Complaint

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Third Party Complaint filed by Reliakor Services, Inc.. (King, Alan) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Wood, Brian) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

2 #1

Certificate of Service

#5

(#5) ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KAT) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Third Party Complaint filed by Reliakor Services, Inc.. (King, Alan) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2020. Fact Discovery due by 6/15/2020. Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 6/15/2020. Motions (disp) due by 6/30/2020. Ready for trial due by 10/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/6/2019. (KAT) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • (#11) (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/6/2019. (KAT) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/6/2019. Scheduling Order to be issued. (KAT) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Ann Amarvi-Brown.(Rauch, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Reliakor Services, Inc. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Rauch, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Third Party Summons Issued as to Reliakor Services, Inc. (lmb) Modified text on 9/30/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Reliakor Services, Inc.. filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-S&C, #2 Exhibit(s) B-Contract) (Wood, Brian) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KAT) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Wood, Brian) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • (#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-2583 SRN/KMM. (CLK) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Wood, Brian) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7166093) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit(s) A-Sumons and Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wood, Brian) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.