This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/06/2021 at 08:19:28 (UTC).

Amaral v. John Bean Technologies Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Amaral filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against John Bean Technologies Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anne C. Conway and Embry J. Kidd. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01474

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anne C. Conway

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MADELINE AMARAL

Defendant

JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony J. Hall

Attorney at The Leach Firm

631 S. Orlando Avenue, #300

Winter Park, FL 32789

Defendant Attorneys

Kimberly J. Doud

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

111 N Orange Ave Ste 1750

Orlando, FL 32801

Natalie J. Storch

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PA

111 North Orange Avenue., Suite 1750

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 9/8/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/8/2021. (PML) ctp (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued as to John Bean Technologies Corporation. (RDO) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Madeline Amaral. Related case(s): No (Hall, Anthony) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Madeline Amaral. (Hall, Anthony) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#8

(#8) RETURN of service executed on 9/13/2021 by Madeline Amaral as to John Bean Technologies Corporation. (Hall, Anthony) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by John Bean Technologies Corporation.(Storch, Natalie) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by John Bean Technologies Corporation. (Storch, Natalie) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by John Bean Technologies Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (Storch, Natalie) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly J. Doud on behalf of John Bean Technologies Corporation (Doud, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly J. Doud on behalf of John Bean Technologies Corporation (Doud, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by John Bean Technologies Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (Storch, Natalie) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by John Bean Technologies Corporation. (Storch, Natalie) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by John Bean Technologies Corporation.(Storch, Natalie) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of service executed on 9/13/2021 by Madeline Amaral as to John Bean Technologies Corporation. (Hall, Anthony) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Madeline Amaral. (Hall, Anthony) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Madeline Amaral. Related case(s): No (Hall, Anthony) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued as to John Bean Technologies Corporation. (RDO) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/8/2021. (PML) ctp (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 9/8/2021. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:21-cv-1474-ACC-EJK. (SJB) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against John Bean Technologies Corportion with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18676607) filed by Madeline Amaral. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hall, Anthony) Text modified on 9/8/2021 (RDO). (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NATALIE JONES STORCH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly J. Doud