This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/26/2022 at 10:42:59 (UTC).

AMANALIGUI et al v. COTTLE et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 AMANALIGUI filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against COTTLE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan D. Wigenton and Jose R. Almonte. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04299

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judge

Jose R. Almonte

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILSON BAQUERO

Rahway, NJ 07065

YOLANDA AMUNATIGUI

Rahway, NJ 07065

Defendants

ROBERT W. COTTLE

MATTHEW HOLLAND

MARK LOSCE

THOMAS E. MCGRATH

INSURANCE COMPANY

BOARD OF ETHICS OF NEVADA

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Application IFP

1 #2

Proposed IFP Order

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Letter

1 #5

Order from District of Nevada

1 #6

Certificate of Service

1 #7

Envelope

1 #8

Notice of Motion

#2

(#2) Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (adc, ) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER that Plaintiffs IFP application is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; that Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and that Plaintiffs shall have thirty (30) days to file an amended complaint and either pay the filing fee or submit a renewed IFP application for each plaintiff that includes sufficient information about his or her income, expenses, and assets. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 8/12/2022. (sm) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#4

(#4) WHEREAS OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 8/12/2022. (sm) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WHEREAS OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 8/12/2022. (sm) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER that Plaintiffs IFP application is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; that Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and that Plaintiffs shall have thirty (30) days to file an amended complaint and either pay the filing fee or submit a renewed IFP application for each plaintiff that includes sufficient information about his or her income, expenses, and assets. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 8/12/2022. (sm) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (adc, ) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Proposed IFP Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Letter, #5 Order from District of Nevada, #6 Certificate of Service, #7 Envelope, #8 Notice of Motion)(adc, ) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Insurance Company B is a litigant