This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/02/2021 at 19:28:39 (UTC).

Amador Contreras v. Armstrong Flooring, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/02/2020 Amador Contreras filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Armstrong Flooring, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry J. Hatter, Jr, John E. McDermott, Philip S. Gutierrez and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03087

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Terry J. Hatter, Jr

Philip S. Gutierrez

Referral Judges

John E. McDermott

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amador Contreras

Defendants

Armstrong Flooring, Inc.

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Claudette Hernandez Villicana

Attorney at Law Offices of Carlin and Buchsbaum LLP

301 East Ocean Boulevard Suite 1550

Long Beach, CA 90802

Gary R Carlin

Attorney at Carlin and Buchsbaum LLP

301 East Ocean Boulevard Suite 1550

Long Beach, CA 90802

Brent S Buchsbaum

Attorney at Carlin and Buchsbaum LLP

301 East Ocean Boulevard Suite 1550

Long Beach, CA 90802

Laurel N Haag

Attorney at Law Offices of Buchsbaum and Haag LLP

100 Oceangate Suite 1200

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant Attorneys

Jolee Land

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar LLP

100 Ashley Drive South Suite 2000

Tampa, FL 33602

Kristen Jeannine Nesbit

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 1590

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Raquel R Jefferson

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar LLP

100 South Ashley Drive Suite 2000

Tampa, FL 33602

Reed L Russell

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar LLP

100 South Ashley Drive Suite 2000

Tampa, FL 33602

Raquel R. Jefferson

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar LLP

100 South Ashley Drive Suite 2000

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#36

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

26 #1

Proposed Order

#26

#7

#6

#5

3 #3

Exhibit C - Notice to Adverse Parties and State Court of Removal of Action

3 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Answer to Complaint

3 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

#3

#2

#1

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) The Court GRANTS the motion for preliminary approval by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement. The Court PRELIMINARILY APPROVES the Settlement Agreement, APPOINTS Plaintiff as Class Representative and APPOINTS the Law Offices of Buchbaum & Haag, LLP as class counsel. The Court also APPOINTS Simplurius as the Settlement Administrator and APPROVES the proposed Class Notice. The final approval hearing is set for June 21, 2021. #35 (See document for further details) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Class Action Settlement and Memorandum of Point and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Land, Jolee) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.: Mediation held on August 27, 2020 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: #MediationParticipantSurvey(Russell, Reed) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/30/2021. (wm) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2021 02:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Jury Trial set for 6/29/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (wm) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Opening Expert Witness Disclosure: 3/30/21, Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosure: 4/27/21, Expert Discovery Cut-off: 5/18/21, Trial Estimate: 5 days. Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2020. Discovery cut-off 3/23/2021. Motions due by 4/6/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2021 02:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 6/29/2021 09:00 AM. (wm) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial premature to estimate-see explanation in Joint Rule 26(f) Report, filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc... (Land, Jolee) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Request for Approval of Substitution of Counsel #26 : The Court hereby orders that the request of: Amador Contreras, to substitute Laurel N. Haag as attorney of record instead of Gary R. Carlin. the clerk is hereby ordered to terminate Notices of Electronic Filing for the withdrawing attorney(s) in this case. (bm) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request For Approval Of Substitution Of Attorney #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests-Substitute Attorney (G-01). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF LIEN filed by plaintiff Amador Contreras. (Carlin, Gary) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketNON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B OF DECLARATION OF JOLEE LAND)(ghap) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Armstrong Flooring, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Amador Contreras. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/21/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A OF DECLARATION OF JOLEE LAND) (ghap) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-02627-PSG (SKx) (C.D. Cal.), 20STCV06871 (Los Angeles Super. Ct.) (Land, Jolee) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc., (Land, Jolee) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc. (Land, Jolee) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Lindsey A. Groft re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 in Support of Notice of Removal of Action filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Land, Jolee) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Jolee Land re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 in Support of Notice of Removal of Action filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to Adverse Parties and State Court of Removal of Action)(Land, Jolee) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Land, Jolee) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV06871 Receipt No: ACACDC-25944688 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Armstrong Flooring, Inc.. (Attorney Jolee Land added to party Armstrong Flooring, Inc.(pty:dft))(Land, Jolee) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Armstrong Flooring, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary R Carlin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent S Buchsbaum

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laurel N Haag