This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:40:11 (UTC).

Alzokari et al v. Mayorkas et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Alzokari filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Mayorkas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Frederic Block. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00294

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frederic Block

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Etab Shafaf Mohamed Alzokari

Kaid Nagip Zokari

Amal Alzewkeri Redhewan

Fayiz Nagip Zokari

Defendants

Alejandro Mayorkas

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Ur Jaddou

Director Kathy A. Baran

Kirt Thompson

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Long Island Field Office

Elizabeth Miller

United States Department of State

National Archives and Records Administration

National Personnel Records Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Julie A. Goldberg

Attorney at Goldberg & Associates

5586 Broadway, Third Floor

Bronx, NY 10463

Defendant Attorney

Sean Patrick Greene-Delgado

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office, EDNY

271 Cadman Plaza East, 7Th Floor

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER Granting Julie A. Goldberg's motion #2 for leave to appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/19/2022. (Innelli, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amal Alzewkeri Redhewan, Kaid Nagip Zokari, Etab Shafaf Mohamed Alzokari, Fayiz Nagip Zokari. Kathy A. Baran served on 3/1/2022, answer due 4/30/2022; Ur Jaddou served on 2/28/2022, answer due 4/29/2022; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 2/28/2022, answer due 4/29/2022; Elizabeth Miller served on 2/28/2022, answer due 4/29/2022; National Archives and Records Administration served on 2/28/2022, answer due 4/29/2022; National Personnel Records Center served on 2/25/2022, answer due 4/26/2022; Kirt Thompson served on 2/28/2022, answer due 4/29/2022; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 2/28/2022, answer due 4/29/2022; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/2/2022, answer due 5/1/2022; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Long Island Field Office served on 3/2/2022, answer due 5/1/2022; United States Department of State served on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Patrick Greene-Delgado on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Greene-Delgado, Sean) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Granting Julie A. Goldberg's motion #2 for leave to appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/19/2022. (Innelli, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Frederic Block. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Julie Goldberg Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-15204708. by Etab Shafaf Mohamed Alzokari, Amal Alzewkeri Redhewan, Fayiz Nagip Zokari, Kaid Nagip Zokari. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation of Julie Goldberg, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against Kathy A. Baran, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Elizabeth Miller, National Archives and Records Administration, National Personnel Records Center, Kirt Thompson, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Long Island Field Office, United States Department of State filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15204635 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Amal Alzewkeri Redhewan, Kaid Nagip Zokari, Etab Shafaf Mohamed Alzokari, Fayiz Nagip Zokari. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Q, #4 Exhibit R - Y, #5 Exhibit Z - GG, #6 Exhibit HH - TT) (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Personnel Records Center is a litigant

Latest cases where National Archives and Records Administration is a litigant

Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant