This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/21/2022 at 06:52:37 (UTC).

Alzanam et al v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Alzanam filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02995

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Belal Alzanam

Alzanam Grocery Corp.

Defendants

United States of America

United States Department of Agriculture

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jess M. Berkowitz

401 Broadwqy

New York, NY 10013

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff

1 #2

Exhibit FNS letter 12/3/2021

1 #3

Exhibit Transaction Reports

1 #4

Exhibit Attorney letter 12/9/2021

1 #5

Exhibit FNS letter 1/18/2022

1 #6

Exhibit Attorney letter 1/27/2022

1 #7

Exhibit Final Agency Decision

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by Belal Alzanam, Alzanam Grocery Corp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Judicial Review against United States Department of Agriculture, United States of America filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15586895 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Not Applicable,, filed by Belal Alzanam, Alzanam Grocery Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit FNS letter 12/3/2021, #3 Exhibit Transaction Reports, #4 Exhibit Attorney letter 12/9/2021, #5 Exhibit FNS letter 1/18/2022, #6 Exhibit Attorney letter 1/27/2022, #7 Exhibit Final Agency Decision) (Berkowitz, Jess) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jess M. Berkowitz