This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2020 at 07:59:02 (UTC).

Alvi v. Majectic Star Casino, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Alvi filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Majectic Star Casino, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James T Moody and John E Martin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00383

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James T Moody

Referral Judge

John E Martin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tanvir Alvi

Crown Point, IN 46307

Defendant

Majectic Star Casino, LLC doing business as The Majestic Star Casino

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lloyd P Mullen

Attorney at Mullen & Associates PC

113 W Joliet Street

Crown Point, IN 46307

Defendant Attorneys

Marcia A Mahony

Attorney at Kightlinger & Gray LLP - Ind/IN

One Indiana Square Ste 300, 211 N Pennsylvania St

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kenneth J Kleppel

Attorney at Kightlinger & Gray LLP - Ind/IN

One Indiana Square Ste 300, 211 N Pennsylvania St

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J Kleppel on behalf of Majectic Star Casino, LLC (Kleppel, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia A Mahony on behalf of Majectic Star Casino, LLC (Mahony, Marcia) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Proposed Summons Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4386221.), filed by Tanvir Alvi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons)(Mullen, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J Kleppel on behalf of Majectic Star Casino, LLC (Kleppel, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia A Mahony on behalf of Majectic Star Casino, LLC (Mahony, Marcia) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Majectic Star Casino, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketSenior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. **NEW CASE** (mrm) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4386221.), filed by Tanvir Alvi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons)(Mullen, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less