This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:09:58 (UTC).

Alvarez v. Wells Global West, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Alvarez filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Wells Global West, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07608

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francisco Alvarez

Defendants

Craig Rehkopf

Wells Global West, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Devlin Joseph Schoop

Attorney at Henderson Parks, LLC

140 South Dearborn, Suite 1020

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorney

Travis J. Ketterman

Attorney at McGann, Ketterman & Rioux

111 East Wacker Drive, Suite 2600

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing set for 1/23/2020 is stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 16 on 1/23/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report. The form is accessible from the court's Internet site, https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_judges/pallmeyer/Report% 20of%20Planning%20Mtg.pdf. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#8

(#8) Defendant, Craig Rehkopf's ANSWER to Complaint by Craig Rehkopf(Ketterman, Travis) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Craig Rehkopf by Travis J. Ketterman (Ketterman, Travis) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisco Alvarez as to Wells Global West, LLC on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Schoop, Devlin) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisco Alvarez as to Craig Rehkopf on 12/21/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Schoop, Devlin) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Francisco Alvarez regarding Summons and Complaint served on Craig Rehkopf on 12/21/2019 (Schoop, Devlin) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#2

(#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 1/23/20 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover

1 #1

Exhibit Group Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Francisco Alvarez; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Schoop, Devlin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing set for 1/23/2020 is stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 16 on 1/23/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report. The form is accessible from the court's Internet site, https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_judges/pallmeyer/Report% 20of%20Planning%20Mtg.pdf. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Defendant, Craig Rehkopf's ANSWER to Complaint by Craig Rehkopf(Ketterman, Travis) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Craig Rehkopf by Travis J. Ketterman (Ketterman, Travis) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisco Alvarez as to Wells Global West, LLC on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Schoop, Devlin) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisco Alvarez as to Craig Rehkopf on 12/21/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Schoop, Devlin) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Francisco Alvarez regarding Summons and Complaint served on Craig Rehkopf on 12/21/2019 (Schoop, Devlin) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Craig Rehkopf (txl, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Wells Global West, LLC (jp, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 1/23/20 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Francisco Alvarez; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Schoop, Devlin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less