This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2020 at 08:21:47 (UTC).

Alvarez v. USA

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Alvarez filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia A. Crone and Zack Hawthorn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00121

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia A. Crone

Referral Judge

Zack Hawthorn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fabian Paredes Alvarez

Adelanto, CA 92301

Respondent

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Michelle Suzanne Englade

Attorney at U S Attorney's Office

350 Magnolia, Suite 150

Beaumont, TX 77701

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Suzanne Englade on behalf of USA (Englade, Michelle) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#3

(#3) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by US Attorney for USA on 4/27/2020 re #2 Order to Show Cause. (bjc, ) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#2

(#2) SHOW CAUSE ORDER that the government shall have 60 days from the date of service to answer the motion to vacate, set aside or correct sentence and show cause why relief prayed for should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 4/21/2020. (bjc, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Fabian Paredes Alvarez.(bjc, ) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Suzanne Englade on behalf of USA (Englade, Michelle) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by US Attorney for USA on 4/27/2020 re #2 Order to Show Cause. (bjc, ) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SHOW CAUSE ORDER that the government shall have 60 days from the date of service to answer the motion to vacate, set aside or correct sentence and show cause why relief prayed for should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 4/21/2020. (bjc, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bjc, ) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Fabian Paredes Alvarez.(bjc, ) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.