This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:31:13 (UTC).

Alvarez v. McAleenan et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Alvarez filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against McAleenan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C. Bramlette, III and Michael T. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00123

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Bramlette, III

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Josep Ramirez Alvarez

Natchez, MS 39120

Defendants

Matthew Albence

U. S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

SHAWN GILLIS

Kevin McAleenan

Phillip Miller

William Barr

United State Department of Homeland Security

Interested Party

Pro Se Department

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER, on or before February 5, 2020, Petitioner is directed to file a response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 1/13/2020. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Change of Address filed by Josep Ramirez Alvarez Josep, 3129 Montana Way,Marietta, GA 30066. (cwl) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

2 #1

Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus

#2

(#2) ORDER, the Clerk directed to edit Petitioners address to include his alien number as A#205-130-421. Petitioner on or before January 10, 2020, must file his signed Petition as directed in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 12/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury)(LDR) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/12/2019) (LDR). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

2 #2

Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury

1 #1

Notice of Assignment

1 #2

Attachment Supplement to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 34643057284.), filed by Josep Ramirez Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Attachment Supplement to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Envelope)(PG) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

3 #1

Envelope

1 #3

Envelope

#3

(#3) REMARK: Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury by plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cwl) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER, on or before February 5, 2020, Petitioner is directed to file a response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 1/13/2020. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Change of Address filed by Josep Ramirez Alvarez Josep, 3129 Montana Way,Marietta, GA 30066. (cwl) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REMARK: Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury by plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cwl) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order #2 , Petition and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury mailed to petitioner. (LDR) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER, the Clerk directed to edit Petitioners address to include his alien number as A#205-130-421. Petitioner on or before January 10, 2020, must file his signed Petition as directed in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 12/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury)(LDR) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/12/2019) (LDR). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 34643057284.), filed by Josep Ramirez Alvarez. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Attachment Supplement to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Envelope)(PG) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less