This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2021 at 07:42:46 (UTC).

Alvarez v. Maplebear, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Alvarez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Maplebear, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine A. Robertson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-30110

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine A. Robertson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jorge L. Alvarez

Springfield, MA 011129

Defendants

Maplebear, Inc. doing business as Instacart

DoorDash, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan D. Persky

Attorney at Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete LLP

535 Boylston Street. Suite 902

Boston, MA 02116

David Bliss Wilson

Attorney at Hirsch Roberts Weinstein

24 Federal Street12Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend by Jorge L. Alvarez to #20 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#20

(#20) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Amend filed by Maplebear, Inc.. (Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#17

(#17) MOTION to Amend Complaint and Add Counts by Jorge L. Alvarez. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

16 #2

Exhibit B - Statement of Information - Doordash, Inc.

16 #1

Exhibit A - Statement of Information - Maplebear, Inc.

16 #16

Main Document

#14

(#14) CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Maplebear, Inc... (Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#19

(#19) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jorge L. Alvarez. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by Jorge L. Alvarez. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration filed by DoorDash, Inc.. (Wilson, David) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#6

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Trevor Reader in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration filed by DoorDash, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wilson, David) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DoorDash, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate SoftBank Group Corp., Other Affiliate SVF FAST (CAYMAN) LIMITED for DoorDash, Inc... (Wilson, David) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by David Bliss Wilson on behalf of DoorDash, Inc. (Wilson, David) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Maplebear, Inc.. (Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit Category Form

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend by Jorge L. Alvarez to #20 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Amend filed by Maplebear, Inc.. (Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Amend Complaint and Add Counts by Jorge L. Alvarez. (Figueroa, Tamara) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Objection to #13 Response to Motion by Maplebear, Inc. (Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement of Information - Maplebear, Inc., #2 Exhibit B - Statement of Information - Doordash, Inc.)(Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re #14 Consent by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Maplebear, Inc. There is no consent form filed by the plaintiff and the defendants have filled in the portion of the form indicating consent and the portion of the form indicating lack of consent. The parties are directed to clarify the question of consent by filing the appropriately completed form or forms by no later than November 30, 2021 (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Maplebear, Inc... (Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jorge L. Alvarez. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jorge L. Alvarez.. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by Jorge L. Alvarez. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. Parties to file the notice regarding consent or non-consent by no later than 11/19/2021. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by Maplebear, Inc.. (Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Stay and Compel Arbitration by Maplebear, Inc..(Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Trevor Reader in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration filed by DoorDash, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wilson, David) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration filed by DoorDash, Inc.. (Wilson, David) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Compel Arbitration by DoorDash, Inc..(Wilson, David) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DoorDash, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate SoftBank Group Corp., Other Affiliate SVF FAST (CAYMAN) LIMITED for DoorDash, Inc... (Wilson, David) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by David Bliss Wilson on behalf of DoorDash, Inc. (Wilson, David) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Healy, Bethaney) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Maplebear, Inc.. (Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Maplebear, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9035691 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Category Form)(Persky, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAPLEBEAR INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Doordash, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Bliss Wilson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan D. Persky