This case was last updated from PACER on 02/21/2020 at 07:11:40 (UTC).

Alvarez-Marquez et al v. Wolf et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Alvarez-Marquez filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Wolf. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul G. Gardephe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11773

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Gardephe

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HENRY YUVINY MARQUEZ PAREDES

DIANA ALVAREZ-MARQUEZ

Henry Yuviny Marguez Paredes

Defendants

Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Enforcement and Removal Operations New York Field Office

Thomas R. Decker

Acting Sec. of DHS Chad Wolf

Acting Director Matthew T. Albence

Department Of Homeland Security

Timothy Robbins

Chad Wolf

Matthew T. Albence

Timothy S. Robbins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Hisey

Attorney at Goldberg & Associates

5586 Broadway, Third Floor

Bronx, NY 10463

Julie A Goldberg

Attorney at Goldberg & Associates, P.C

314 West 231 Street, Suite 447

Bronx, NY 10463

Defendant Attorney

Michael James Byars

U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny (Chambers Street), 86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Julie A. Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/20/2020) (rro) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#8

(#8) OPINION & ORDER: Accordingly, based upon the above and the arguments made to me on December 24, 2019, it is hereby: ORDERED that Plaintiffs' application for emergency relief is DENIED. Plaintiffs are directed to file on the electronic docket the supporting documents that were previously submitted directly to my chambers. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent that Plaintiffs intend to move for a preliminary injunction, they are directed to meet and confer with the Government and submit a proposed briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick, Part 1 on 1/7/2020) (rro) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Julie A. Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/20/2020) (rro) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Julie Ann Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Julie Ann Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Diana Alvarez-Marquez, Henry Yuviny Marguez Paredes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Julie A. Goldberg, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) OPINION & ORDER: Accordingly, based upon the above and the arguments made to me on December 24, 2019, it is hereby: ORDERED that Plaintiffs' application for emergency relief is DENIED. Plaintiffs are directed to file on the electronic docket the supporting documents that were previously submitted directly to my chambers. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent that Plaintiffs intend to move for a preliminary injunction, they are directed to meet and confer with the Government and submit a proposed briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick, Part 1 on 1/7/2020) (rro) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #7 MOTION for Julie Ann Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18408788. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California; Missing Motion for Pro Hac Vice;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Julie Ann Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18408788. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Diana Alvarez-Marquez, Henry Yuviny Marguez Paredes. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order For Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Julie A. Goldberg)(Goldberg, Julie) Modified on 1/2/2020 (wb). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pc) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PETITION IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Matthew T. Albence, Thomas R. Decker, Department Of Homeland Security, Enforcement and Removal Operations New York Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Timothy S. Robbins, Chad Wolf.Document filed by Diana Alvarez-Marquez, Henry Yuviny Marguez Paredes.(Hisey, Eric) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated December 26, 2019 re: correction to ECF No. 4. Document filed by Matthew T. Albence, Thomas R. Decker, Department Of Homeland Security, Enforcement and Removal Operations New York Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Timothy S. Robbins, Chad Wolf.(Byars, Michael) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from AUSA Michael J. Byars dated December 26, 2019 re: status. Document filed by Matthew T. Albence, Thomas R. Decker, Department Of Homeland Security, Enforcement and Removal Operations New York Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Timothy S. Robbins, Chad Wolf.(Byars, Michael) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Eric Hisey to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 12/31/2019. (pc) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Eric Hisey. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Matthew T. Albence, Thomas R. Decker, Timothy Robbins, Chad Wolf, DIANA ALVAREZ-MARQUEZ, HENRY YUVINY MARQUEZ PAREDES. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, Thomas R. Decker, Department Of Homeland Security, Enforcement and Removal Operations New York Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Timothy Robbins. (Byars, Michael) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hisey, Eric) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT against Matthew T. Albence, Thomas R. Decker, Department Of Homeland Security, Enforcement and Removal Operations New York Field Office, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Timothy Robbins, Chad Wolf. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18351773)Document filed by DIANA ALVAREZ-MARQUEZ, HENRY YUVINY MARQUEZ PAREDES.(Hisey, Eric) Modified on 12/26/2019 (pc). (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.