Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2021 at 09:46:00 (UTC).

ALVARADO v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 ALVARADO filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois H. Goodman and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00349

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NILDA ALVARADO

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL

COSMETIC TOILETRY AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHELLE A. PARFITT

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

1825 K Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

PATRICIA LEIGH O'DELL

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

218 Commerce Street, P.O. Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorneys

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (km) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#10

(#10) Short Form Complaint by NILDA ALVARADO. (O'DELL, PATRICIA) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA LEIGH O'DELL on behalf of NILDA ALVARADO (O'DELL, PATRICIA) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-03621. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#6

(#6) EMAIL from the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-243) dated 1/6/2021 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Freda L. Wolfson for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2738) (ztnr) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE pursuant to R.P.J.P.M.L. 4.1(b) by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (ztth) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NILDA ALVARADO. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-3489 and MDL No. 3:16-md-2738. (Parfitt, Michelle) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

1 #4

Summons Personal Care Products Council

1 #3

Summons Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.

1 #2

Summons Johnson & Johnson

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (km) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Short Form Complaint by NILDA ALVARADO. (O'DELL, PATRICIA) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA LEIGH O'DELL on behalf of NILDA ALVARADO (O'DELL, PATRICIA) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr, ) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-03621. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EMAIL from the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-243) dated 1/6/2021 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Freda L. Wolfson for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2738) (ztnr) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE pursuant to R.P.J.P.M.L. 4.1(b) by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (ztth) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NILDA ALVARADO. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-3489 and MDL No. 3:16-md-2738. (Parfitt, Michelle) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BDCDC-7948441) filed by NILDA ALVARADO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., #4 Summons Personal Care Products Council)(Parfitt, Michelle) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL is a litigant

Latest cases where COSMETIC, TOILETRY, AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATRICIA LEIGH O'DELL